Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Master: AS Laetitia - Container Ship / 2020-03-10 - 2020-08-04 (5 months)
Master: AS Fatima - Dry Cargo / 2019-08-11 - 2019-12-22 (4 months)
Master: Cape Moreton - Container Ship / 2019-02-09 - 2019-06-28 (5 months)
Master: Maersk Warsaw - Dry Cargo / 2018-08-13 - 2018-12-10 (4 months)
Master: Delphinus - Container Ship / 2017-11-09 - 2018-05-26 (7 months)
Master: Rotterdam - Cruise Liner / 2020-01-18 - 2020-07-29 (6 months)
Staff Captain: Rotterdam - Passenger vessel / 2019-08-04 - 2019-11-04 (3 months)
Staff Captain: Rotterdam - Passenger vessel / 2019-03-24 - 2019-05-18 (2 months)
Staff Captain: Rotterdam - Passenger vessel / 2018-09-28 - 2019-01-06 (3 months)
Staff Captain: rotterdam - Passenger vessel / 2018-03-25 - 2018-06-16 (3 months)
Chief Officer: FRONT PRINCESS - VLCC / 2022-05-10 - 2022-09-14 (4 months)
Chief Officer: FRONT EARL - VLCC / 2021-07-29 - 2021-11-02 (3 months)
Chief Officer: ECO SEAS - VLCC / 2020-11-20 - 2021-03-09 (4 months)
Master: EPICURUS - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-18 - 2020-05-13 (4 months)
Chief Officer: EPICURUS - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-27 - 2020-01-17 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Bulk Endurance - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-07 - 2019-10-24 (6 months)
Chief Officer: JULIA OLDENDORFF - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-18 - 2018-09-19 (6 months)
Chief Officer: JOHANN OLDENDORFF - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-27 - 2017-09-27 (4 months)
Chief Officer: ST. GEORGE - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-14 - 2016-08-28 (4 months)
Chief Officer: ST. GEORGE - Bulk Carrier / 2015-06-14 - 2015-12-06 (6 months)
Master: Almeria - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-19 - 2019-06-21 (7 months)
Master: Almeria - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-12 - 2018-08-10 (8 months)
Master: PICTOR - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-19 - 2018-12-28 (6 months)
Master: Matteo BR - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-02 - 2017-10-20 (6 months)
Master: Matteo BR - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-26 - 2016-09-27 (5 months)
Master: Velvet - Bulk Carrier / 2015-03-07 - 2015-09-30 (7 months)
Master: Andean - Bulk Carrier / 2014-05-13 - 2014-11-21 (6 months)
Master: TRF Kaya - Container Ship / 2018-08-14 - 2018-12-09 (4 months)
Master: TRF Kaya - Container Ship / 2017-11-28 - 2018-04-12 (4 months)
Master: Crux - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-20 - 2018-11-27 (4 months)
Master: Conmar Bay - Container Ship / 2018-02-09 - 2018-06-15 (4 months)
Master: Conmar Hawk - Container Ship / 2017-05-22 - 2017-09-08 (4 months)
Master: Conmar Avenue - Container Ship / 2016-11-15 - 2016-12-28 (1 month)
Master: Conmar Fjord - Container Ship / 2016-09-21 - 2016-11-15 (2 months)
Master: Neftegaz 70 - AHTS / 2018-04-25 - 2018-09-03 (4 months)
Master: Neftegaz70 - AHTS / 2017-09-01 - 2017-12-28 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Neftegaz70 - AHTS / 2017-02-27 - 2017-06-05 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Neftegaz70 - AHTS / 2016-08-07 - 2016-10-31 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Crystal West - Bunkering Vessel / 2015-08-18 - 2015-12-14 (4 months)
Master: Mongolia - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-03-03 - 2018-08-08 (5 months)
Master: Mongolia - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-10-21 - 2018-02-04 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Aikaterini - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-11-09 - 2017-07-12 (8 months)
Chief Officer: GP T1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-09-05 - 2016-02-13 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Leon - Chemical tanker / 2014-10-16 - 2015-04-30 (6 months)
Master: ANNA 2005 - General cargo / 2017-12-26 - 2018-06-30 (6 months)
Master: ANNA 2005 - General cargo / 2017-06-02 - 2017-11-10 (5 months)
Master: UNITED OCEAN - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-02-15 - 2016-12-06 (10 months)
Master: Tevfik bay - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-09-14 - 2015-12-29 (3 months)
Master: ESI ANAX - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-02-21 - 2015-04-23 (2 months)
Master: Maersk Alfirk - Container Ship / 2017-07-31 - 2018-01-16 (6 months)
Master: Maersk Alfirk - Container Ship / 2016-11-22 - 2017-03-27 (4 months)
Master: CMA CGM Mekong - Container Ship / 2016-02-07 - 2016-07-01 (5 months)
Master: Maersk Saltoro - Container Ship / 2015-07-12 - 2015-12-05 (5 months)
Master: Maersk Sarnia - Container Ship / 2014-07-30 - 2014-12-05 (4 months)
Master: Zephyr 1 - Seismic vessel / 2016-01-09 - 2018-03-08 (2 years)
Master: Zephyr 1 - Seismic vessel / 2017-07-11 - 2017-10-26 (3 months)
Master: Zephyr 1 - Seismic vessel / 2014-11-24 - 2015-01-29 (2 months)
Master: Zephyr 1 - Seismic vessel / 2014-05-28 - 2014-08-26 (3 months)
Master: Zephyr I - Seismic vessel / 2012-02-02 - 2012-11-22 (10 months)
Master: Thorco Marjanne - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-08-23 - 2017-08-23 (1 year)
Master: Union Onyx - Tug boat / 2013-01-04 - 2013-12-25 (12 months)
Master: BEAUTRADER - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2012-09-17 - 2012-12-14 (3 months)
Master: BEAUFORCE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2011-11-18 - 2012-06-09 (7 months)
Master: Eems Transporter - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2010-12-06 - 2011-01-25 (2 months)
Master: ES Thunder - AHTS / 2017-03-17 - 2017-08-13 (5 months)
Master: AOS Triumph - AHTS / 2016-12-22 - 2017-03-04 (2 months)
Master: AOS Handler - AHTS / 2016-04-04 - 2016-09-07 (5 months)
Master: AOS Provider - AHTS / 2015-09-05 - 2016-01-19 (4 months)
Master: Masindra Hawk - Platform Supply vessel / 2015-03-07 - 2015-04-14 (1 month)
Master: TINA C - General cargo / 2015-06-17 - 2015-11-12 (5 months)
Master: ARUCAS - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-08-25 - 2015-01-30 (5 months)
Master: RMS Buchholz - General cargo / 2013-09-03 - 2013-10-23 (2 months)
Master: Akela - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-01-23 - 2013-05-27 (4 months)
Master: Christina - General cargo / 2012-08-03 - 2012-11-29 (4 months)
Master: NJORD THYRA - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-05-28 - 2015-08-10 (2 months)
Master: NJORD THYRA - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-08-23 - 2014-12-29 (4 months)
Master: MARILENA - Chemical tanker / 2013-12-19 - 2014-05-24 (5 months)
Master: MARILENA - Chemical tanker / 2013-03-13 - 2013-08-28 (5 months)
Master: M.Y. ANTARCTIC - Chemical tanker / 2012-07-13 - 2012-12-23 (5 months)
Master: Elisa Delmas - Container Ship / 2015-01-25 - 2015-05-26 (4 months)
Master: CMA CGM Okapi - Container Ship / 2014-07-27 - 2014-10-26 (3 months)
Master: Condor - Container Ship / 2014-01-06 - 2014-06-02 (5 months)
Master: Corsar - Container Ship / 2013-05-17 - 2013-10-22 (5 months)
Master: Condor - Container Ship / 2012-07-13 - 2012-12-14 (5 months)
Master: Champion - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-01-18 - 2014-04-23 (3 months)
Master: Pioneer - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-12-04 - 2013-03-13 (3 months)
Master: Pioneer - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-06-18 - 2012-09-10 (3 months)
Master: Mount Olympus - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-04-28 - 2012-06-18 (2 months)
Master: ASABA-2 - Bunkering Vessel / 2011-11-25 - 2012-02-27 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Coral Sea Fos - AHTS / 2010-05-11 - 2010-09-11 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Arabian Sea Fos - AHTS / 2009-07-07 - 2009-12-08 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Med Fos - AHTS / 2008-08-12 - 2009-02-14 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Furkan - Coaster / 2007-08-29 - 2008-01-15 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Kendrick - AHTS / 2006-06-07 - 2007-05-25 (12 months)