Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Master: Maersk Nottingham - Container Ship / 2014-12-05 - 2015-03-22 (4 months)
Master: Mozart - Container Ship / 2014-04-14 - 2014-08-11 (4 months)
Master: Jervis Bay - Container Ship / 2013-05-31 - 2013-10-18 (5 months)
Master: Maersk Delano - Container Ship / 2012-10-11 - 2013-01-21 (3 months)
Master: Neddloyd Honshu - Container Ship / 2012-03-14 - 2012-06-19 (3 months)
Master: Akademik Golitsyn - Research vessel / 2014-10-22 - 2015-02-28 (4 months)
Master: Akademik Golitsyn - Research vessel / 2014-01-28 - 2014-06-06 (4 months)
Master: Akademik Golitsyn - Research vessel / 2013-04-29 - 2013-09-13 (4 months)
Master: Akademik Golitsyn - Research vessel / 2012-08-10 - 2012-12-09 (4 months)
Master: Akademik Golitsyn - Research vessel / 2011-11-28 - 2012-04-05 (4 months)
Master: Thorco Svendborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-06-15 - 2014-12-15 (6 months)
Master: Alaed - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2012-12-28 - 2013-07-30 (7 months)
Master: Celtic Fortune - General cargo / 2012-06-15 - 2012-10-18 (4 months)
Master: Hanna C - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2011-07-04 - 2011-10-11 (3 months)
Master: Celtic King - Container Ship / 2010-10-09 - 2011-01-15 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Leon - Chemical tanker / 2015-12-03 - 2016-04-16 (4 months)
Master: Norvarg - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-09-22 - 2014-10-02 (10 days)
Master: Norvarg - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-01-05 - 2014-05-23 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Norvarg - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-05-18 - 2013-08-29 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Norvarg - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-07-16 - 2012-10-29 (3 months)
Master: Merit - General cargo / 2013-08-06 - 2014-08-29 (1 year)
Master: Merle - Dry Cargo / 2012-09-20 - 2013-03-19 (6 months)
Master: Cora Jo - Dry Cargo / 2011-11-11 - 2012-03-29 (5 months)
Master: Jolyn - Dry Cargo / 2011-03-23 - 2011-07-27 (4 months)
Master: Jolyn - Dry Cargo / 2010-09-22 - 2010-12-23 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Running on Waves - Passenger vessel / 2016-03-07 - 2016-07-30 (5 months)
Master: Geocean Protis - Pipe laying vessel / 2013-09-10 - 2014-05-01 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Star Clipper - Passenger vessel / 2013-02-10 - 2013-07-25 (5 months)
Barge Master: Jascon 39 / Jascon 2 - Accomodation barge / 2008-03-15 - 2011-03-10 (2 years)
Chief Officer: Royal Clipper - Passenger vessel / 2006-10-10 - 2007-05-21 (7 months)
Chief Officer: HH EAST - Container Ship / 2017-06-20 - 2017-12-14 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Kalliopi R.C. - Container Ship / 2015-09-04 - 2016-02-25 (6 months)
Chief Officer: HH WEST - Container Ship / 2015-02-21 - 2015-06-17 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Munich Trader - Container Ship / 2014-07-12 - 2014-11-04 (4 months)
Master: Carolina - Container Ship / 2013-12-03 - 2014-03-31 (4 months)
Senior DPO: Smit Kamara - MRSV / 2013-01-06 - 2013-03-07 (2 months)
Senior DPO: Smit Kamara - MRSV / 2012-08-28 - 2012-10-31 (2 months)
Senior DPO: Smit Kamara - MRSV / 2012-03-30 - 2012-07-11 (3 months)
Senior DPO: Smit Kamara - MRSV / 2011-12-05 - 2012-02-08 (2 months)
DP Officer: EDT Ares - DSV (Diving Support) / 2011-06-07 - 2011-08-10 (2 months)
Chief Officer: SANTA URSULA - Container Ship / 2016-05-16 - 2016-07-25 (2 months)
Chief Officer: SANTA CRUZ - Container Ship / 2013-06-30 - 2013-10-09 (3 months)
Master: MAERSK NOLANVILLE - Container Ship / 2011-09-15 - 2011-10-21 (1 month)
Chief Officer: MAERSK STRALSUND - Container Ship / 2010-12-23 - 2011-05-08 (4 months)
Chief Officer: MAERSK SEOUL - Container Ship / 2010-09-06 - 2010-09-26 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Kashima Maru - Fishing vessel / 2009-01-16 - 2013-04-16 (4 years)
Chief Officer: Mys Datta - Fishing vessel / 2005-01-01 - 2008-04-16 (3 years)
Master: Mys Chuprova - Fishing vessel / 2001-01-01 - 2004-01-16 (3 years)
Chief Officer: Mys Sheltinga - Fishing vessel / 1995-02-16 - 2000-01-16 (4 years)
Master: Arionas - Container Ship / 2024-05-31 - 2024-10-25 (5 months)
Master: Tunadal - Container Ship / 2023-12-25 - 2024-03-23 (3 months)
Master: Buxmelody - Container Ship / 2023-06-25 - 2023-11-09 (4 months)
Master: Buxmelody - Container Ship / 2022-08-11 - 2022-11-22 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Buxmelody - Container Ship / 2022-07-06 - 2022-08-10 (1 month)
Master: YALE - VLCC / 2024-05-15 - 2024-09-10 (4 months)
Master: PAPA - VLCC / 2023-07-15 - 2024-01-10 (6 months)
Chief Officer: PHOEBE - VLCC / 2022-12-29 - 2023-05-07 (4 months)
Chief Officer: AURA M - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-01-15 - 2022-06-17 (5 months)
Chief Officer: OMAN PRIDE - VLCC / 2021-06-01 - 2021-12-06 (6 months)
Master: CMA CGM Chennai - Container Ship / 2024-04-29 - 2024-09-05 (4 months)
Master: ZIM Shenzhen - Container Ship / 2023-10-27 - 2024-02-20 (4 months)
Master: Seaspan Tokyo (ex.Budapest Bridge) - Container Ship / 2022-05-06 - 2022-12-19 (7 months)
Master: Del Monte Rose - Container Ship / 2021-08-08 - 2021-12-27 (5 months)
Master: Del Monte Gold - Container Ship / 2021-01-17 - 2021-06-06 (5 months)
Master: Kardam - Bulk Carrier / 2024-04-14 - 2024-08-31 (5 months)
Master: Malamir - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-22 - 2023-12-27 (4 months)
Master: Trade - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-22 - 2023-04-20 (6 months)
Master: Bliss - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-13 - 2022-07-19 (6 months)
Master: Paloma - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-23 - 2021-11-19 (3 months)
Master: DART TRADER - Bulk Carrier / 2024-04-11 - 2024-08-30 (5 months)
Master: DART TRADER - Bulk Carrier / 2023-07-23 - 2023-12-11 (5 months)
Master: FILIA GLORY - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-22 - 2022-12-11 (1 year)
Master: STAR HYPERION - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-25 - 2021-06-28 (3 months)
Master: LEVANTES - Bulk Carrier / 2020-05-23 - 2020-10-14 (5 months)
Master: Caspian Harmony - Heavy lift vessel / 2024-05-31 - 2024-08-21 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Gotland - Heavy lift vessel / 2023-11-08 - 2024-02-20 (3 months)
Chief Officer: FRIGG W - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-05-29 - 2023-08-30 (3 months)
Chief Officer: SIGYN W - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-04-10 - 2023-05-26 (2 months)
Chief Officer: FRIGG W - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2022-11-28 - 2023-02-21 (3 months)
Master: Industrial Ruby - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2024-04-08 - 2024-07-22 (3 months)
Master: Eihwaz - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-01 - 2023-11-04 (2 months)
Master: Libera C - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-05 - 2023-08-31 (3 months)
Master: Um Elhanaya - Bulk Carrier / 2023-01-20 - 2023-02-05 (1 month)
Master: Cas Avanca - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-20 - 2022-10-28 (2 months)
Master: Panay - Container Ship / 2024-03-15 - 2024-07-22 (4 months)
Master: Panay - Container Ship / 2023-06-29 - 2023-11-11 (4 months)
Master: Atlantic West - Container Ship / 2022-07-21 - 2022-11-11 (4 months)
Master: Cape Magnus - Container Ship / 2021-08-28 - 2022-01-07 (4 months)
Master: Lantau Arrow - Container Ship / 2021-03-06 - 2021-06-15 (3 months)
Master: Neve - Crude Oil Tanker / 2024-05-05 - 2024-07-02 (2 months)
Master: Zarya - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-10-31 - 2023-04-01 (5 months)
Master: Barbarosa - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-04-27 - 2021-08-28 (4 months)
Master: Barbarosa - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-15 - 2020-12-09 (6 months)
Master: Aljalaa - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-11-18 - 2020-04-19 (5 months)
Master: BERNIS - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-27 - 2024-06-30 (6 months)
Master: BERMONDI - Bulk Carrier / 2023-01-31 - 2023-07-21 (6 months)
Master: BERMONDI - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-08 - 2022-08-26 (6 months)
Master: ATHOS - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-16 - 2021-12-14 (5 months)
Master: COUNTESS I - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-23 - 2021-02-19 (5 months)