Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Officer: Messina Strait - Reefer / 2016-10-10 - 2017-03-10 (5 months)
Junior DP Officer: Fuji Bay - Reefer / 2015-12-18 - 2016-05-27 (5 months)
Junior DP Officer: Baltic Klipper - Other vessels / 2015-01-25 - 2015-08-11 (7 months)
Junior DP Officer: Aconcagua Bay - Reefer / 2014-02-18 - 2014-08-21 (6 months)
OS: Skaubryn - RO-RO / 2012-12-03 - 2013-07-31 (8 months)
Junior DP Officer: Greatship Aditi - AHTS / 2016-02-14 - 2016-04-13 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Caspian Maria - Platform Supply vessel / 2015-07-21 - 2015-10-20 (3 months)
Junior DP Officer: Hamed Glory - AHTS / 2015-02-06 - 2015-05-10 (3 months)
Junior DP Officer: Hamed Glory - AHTS / 2014-05-13 - 2014-08-15 (3 months)
Junior DP Officer: Richard M Currence - AHTS / 2013-12-19 - 2014-03-11 (3 months)
Master: Salvaree - AHT / 2016-07-23 - 2016-09-20 (2 months)
Master: Salvaree - AHTS / 2016-03-07 - 2016-06-01 (3 months)
Master: Zakher Commander - AHTS / 2015-09-08 - 2015-12-05 (3 months)
Junior DP Officer: Smit Lumba - AHTS / 2015-05-02 - 2015-07-13 (2 months)
Junior DP Officer: Smit Lumba - AHTS / 2014-12-28 - 2015-03-07 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Dina Star - MRSV / 2014-10-01 - 2014-11-11 (1 month)
Junior DP Officer: Dina Star - MRSV / 2014-07-08 - 2014-08-20 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Jascon 34 - Accomodation barge / 2014-04-06 - 2014-06-15 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Rem Supplier - Offshore Supply vessel / 2014-01-21 - 2014-02-26 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Rem Supplier - Offshore Supply vessel / 2014-01-01 - 2014-01-21 (1 month)
Junior DP Officer: SCF PACIFICA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2011-09-19 - 2012-01-14 (4 months)
AB Seaman: SCF BYRRANGA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2009-04-19 - 2009-12-08 (8 months)
AB Seaman: STENA COMPASS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2008-04-08 - 2008-11-11 (7 months)
AB Seaman: SCF VALDAI - Crude Oil Tanker / 2006-08-09 - 2007-02-04 (6 months)
AB Seaman: STAR X - Crude Oil Tanker / 2005-09-23 - 2006-05-22 (8 months)
Junior DP Officer: MV [Veerseborg - General cargo / 2017-06-21 - 2017-09-01 (2 months)
AB Seaman: MV [Veerseborg - General cargo / 2017-04-21 - 2017-06-21 (2 months)
AB Seaman: MV Cara - General cargo / 2016-05-17 - 2016-12-16 (7 months)
AB Seaman: MV Veerseborg - General cargo / 2015-02-15 - 2015-06-17 (4 months)
AB / Welder: MV Fitburg - General cargo / 2014-05-16 - 2014-09-12 (4 months)
Master: Transund - Bulk Carrier / 2022-04-01 - 2022-12-16 (8 months)
Master: Arklow Moor - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-14 - 2021-08-17 (3 months)
Master: Arklow Marsh - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-19 - 2021-01-19 (2 months)
Junior DP Officer: Wybelsum - Container Ship / 2015-03-12 - 2015-07-01 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: LPG Gas Arjuna - LPG / LNG / 2017-11-08 - 2018-12-03 (1 year)
Junior DP Officer: Atlantic Mermaid - Reefer / 2016-03-19 - 2016-09-30 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Atlantic Reefer - Reefer / 2015-04-07 - 2015-09-20 (5 months)
AB Seaman: GUBAB - Tug boat / 2021-04-27 - 2021-08-08 (3 months)
AB Seaman: EGMAIS - Tug boat / 2021-03-09 - 2021-04-26 (2 months)
Junior DP Officer: Bold Maverick - DSV (Diving Support) / 2011-11-19 - 2012-01-07 (2 months)
2nd Officer: WG Amundsen - Seismic vessel / 2011-08-11 - 2011-09-18 (1 month)
2nd Officer: western Patriot - Seismic vessel / 2011-05-13 - 2011-06-20 (1 month)
Junior DP Officer: Vos Satisfaction - DSV (Diving Support) / 2011-03-16 - 2011-04-14 (1 month)
Junior DP Officer: Vos satisfaction - DSV (Diving Support) / 2011-01-19 - 2011-02-17 (1 month)
Safety and Operations Manager: Crossway Dolphin - Jack-up Platform / 2018-11-05 - 2020-01-05 (1 year)
Safety and Operations Manager: Crossway Eagle - Accommodation barge / 2013-11-05 - 2016-08-24 (2 years)
Chief Officer: Etesco Millennium - Semi-submersible platform / 2012-08-01 - 2013-05-24 (10 months)
Chief Officer: Star I - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-04-10 - 2022-08-31 (5 months)
Boatswain: 5466 - Chemical tanker / 2013-02-20 - 2013-12-29 (10 months)
Chief Cook: zxcz - Chemical tanker / 2011-02-15 - 2013-12-21 (2 years)
Junior DP Officer: sfdsdf - Bunkering Vessel / 2013-12-02 - 2013-12-21 (1 month)
DP Officer: Bourbon Liberty 251 - ROV Support vessel / 2013-05-14 - 2013-07-02 (2 months)
Junior DP Officer: Stena Carron - Drilling Vessel / 2011-04-14 - 2013-04-18 (2 years)
Deck Cadet: AHTS 'FIVEL' - AHTS / 2009-06-03 - 2009-09-03 (3 months)
DP Officer: Bourbon Liverty 241 - AHTS / 2015-09-10 - 2015-11-10 (2 months)
DP Officer: Bourbon Liberty 241 - AHTS / 2015-05-15 - 2015-07-03 (2 months)
DP Officer: Bourbon Liberty 241 - AHTS / 2015-02-06 - 2015-03-27 (2 months)
Junior DP Officer: Bourbon Liberty 303 - AHTS / 2014-10-15 - 2014-12-09 (2 months)