Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: Primus - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-14 - 2024-04-06 (8 months)
OS: Comet - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-01 - 2022-12-21 (1 year)
OS: Typhoon - Tug boat / 2021-03-02 - 2021-08-31 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: MUSE - General cargo / 2020-01-02 - 2020-03-05 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Кентавр - Tug boat / 2019-05-10 - 2019-06-06 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Kopersand - General cargo / 2018-11-22 - 2019-04-21 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Pacific Future - General cargo / 2017-06-25 - 2017-12-29 (6 months)
Motorman: Виктори - Tug boat / 2017-02-06 - 2017-04-07 (2 months)
Motorman: патриот буксир - Tug boat / 2016-05-10 - 2016-06-17 (1 month)
Wiper: m/v Trent Navigator - General cargo / 2020-07-24 - 2020-12-20 (5 months)
Wiper: m/v WEC Vermeer - Container Ship / 2019-12-27 - 2020-03-03 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: m/v Columbus - Passenger vessel / 2018-09-09 - 2019-04-03 (7 months)
Motorman: MANISA FLOYEN - General cargo / 2023-05-22 - 2023-09-17 (4 months)
Motorman: ELBSKY - Container Ship / 2022-06-22 - 2022-09-18 (3 months)
Wiper: Merito - Container Ship / 2021-11-01 - 2022-03-03 (4 months)
Motorman: Bjorg - Container Ship / 2020-06-07 - 2020-10-11 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Nicole C - General cargo / 2018-12-10 - 2019-03-19 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: PALLADA - General cargo / 2019-12-01 - 2020-02-10 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: RED JACKET - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-12 - 2019-03-13 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: RED JACKET - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-02 - 2018-03-15 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Kapitan shligin - Tug boat / 2020-06-04 - 2020-11-20 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Octopus S - General cargo / 2018-08-05 - 2019-02-12 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Orion - Tug boat / 2017-02-06 - 2017-07-31 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Volzhsky 8 - General cargo / 2023-03-10 - 2023-07-10 (4 months)
Motorman: Valentin Pikul - NAVY / 2019-09-20 - 2021-09-20 (2 years)
Engine Cadet: Knyaz Vladimir - Cruise Liner / 2018-11-23 - 2019-02-08 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: VM-86 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-03-01 - 2018-07-16 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Masal - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-10-14 - 2021-06-27 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: SPARTAKOS - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-09-04 - 2019-02-07 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: NBCO 3 - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-08-18 - 2018-02-11 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Verbena - General cargo / 2024-05-01 - 2024-06-20 (2 months)
Trainee Engineer: M/V Clipper Kalavryta - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-05 - 2021-08-17 (4 months)
Trainee Engineer: M/V Clipper Triumph - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-27 - 2020-12-17 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: MSC Julia R - Container Ship / 2018-02-14 - 2018-08-29 (6 months)
Wiper: Grande Ghana - RO-RO / 2022-03-12 - 2022-11-07 (8 months)
Wiper: REPUBBLICA ARGENTINA - RO-RO / 2021-10-08 - 2021-11-24 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Johannah - General cargo / 2017-06-05 - 2018-06-20 (1 year)
Engineer Assistant: YAS - Yacht / 2021-11-01 - 2023-02-01 (1 year)
Motorman: YAS - Yacht / 2018-10-01 - 2021-07-01 (2 years)
Engine Cadet: Brigadir - Tug boat / 2018-02-05 - 2018-05-05 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Renate - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-03 - 2017-10-29 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: M.T.Baltimore 1 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-02-05 - 2018-03-14 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Aida 4 - Training Ship / 2017-11-27 - 2017-12-14 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Polkoviniok Fesenko V.K - General cargo / 2017-03-22 - 2017-09-10 (6 months)
4th Engineer: MSC SHANNON - Container Ship / 2021-05-08 - 2021-11-05 (6 months)
Engineer Assistant: MSC SHANNON - Container Ship / 2020-02-01 - 2020-08-27 (7 months)
Engineer Assistant: MSC SHANNON - Container Ship / 2019-02-28 - 2019-09-10 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MSC SHANNON - Container Ship / 2017-06-14 - 2017-11-29 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Tanker Valletta - Chemical tanker / 2017-03-10 - 2017-09-21 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: тх Хаджебей - Cruise Liner / 2015-11-03 - 2016-02-05 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: тх Хаджебей - Passenger vessel / 2015-07-15 - 2015-10-20 (3 months)
Wiper: m/v “Sheila” - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-15 - 2021-10-08 (9 months)
Motorman: Sormovskiy 119 - Dry Cargo / 2020-01-10 - 2020-07-24 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Alkor - Dry Cargo / 2017-02-20 - 2017-08-20 (6 months)
Motorman: DOBRYNYA NIKITICH - General cargo / 2017-11-10 - 2018-04-16 (5 months)
Motorman: RODION OSLYABYA - General cargo / 2017-10-08 - 2017-11-08 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: DOBRYNYA NIKITICH - General cargo / 2016-12-15 - 2017-05-13 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: m/v Hadzhebey - Passenger vessel / 2014-11-01 - 2015-02-06 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: m/v Hadzhebey - Passenger vessel / 2014-07-08 - 2014-10-11 (3 months)
Wiper : BBC Coral - Heavy lift vessel / 2018-04-04 - 2018-10-05 (6 months)
Wiper : BBC Africa - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-04-27 - 2017-11-28 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Mittelplate - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-08-12 - 2017-02-14 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: M/V Toto br - General cargo / 2018-11-25 - 2019-03-25 (4 months)
Wiper: M/V Toto br - General cargo / 2017-08-01 - 2018-01-20 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: M/V Rita br - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-05 - 2017-02-04 (8 months)
OOW Engine: RHOURD ENOUSS - LPG / LNG / 2019-11-01 - 2019-11-22 (1 month)
Motorman: Elandra Angel - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-02-13 - 2019-06-13 (4 months)
Wiper : Ainazi - Chemical tanker / 2018-06-20 - 2018-10-07 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Coral Palmata - LPG / LNG / 2016-02-08 - 2016-07-08 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: SILJA FESTIVAL - RO-RO / 2013-01-16 - 2013-03-17 (2 months)
Motorman: Petrel bulker - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-25 - 2022-10-30 (8 months)
Motorman: Forsa - Fishing vessel / 2021-05-13 - 2021-12-14 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Kruzenshtern - Sailing Vessel / 2016-04-22 - 2016-06-21 (2 months)