Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
4th Engineer: OWL 6 - Chemical tanker / 2023-04-24 - 2023-12-08 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Style - Chemical tanker / 2022-01-19 - 2022-10-18 (9 months)
Motorman: Style - Chemical tanker / 2021-03-09 - 2021-09-09 (6 months)
Motorman: LIDA - Dry Cargo / 2019-11-28 - 2020-07-07 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Varamo - Container Ship / 2014-08-16 - 2015-02-03 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Dana 1 - General cargo / 2016-01-26 - 2016-08-31 (7 months)
Motorman: Dana 1 - General cargo / 2015-11-18 - 2016-01-25 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Emma Janneke - General cargo / 2014-07-09 - 2015-01-11 (6 months)
Motorman: 2036 - Tug boat / 2014-02-03 - 2014-04-07 (2 months)
4th Engineer: Jasmine A - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-07 - 2021-02-13 (7 months)
Oiler: Em Spetses - Container Ship / 2019-01-26 - 2019-07-17 (6 months)
Oiler: Em Athens - Container Ship / 2017-02-20 - 2017-09-16 (7 months)
Wiper: Em Astoria - Container Ship / 2015-04-17 - 2015-10-20 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: TB Brigadir - Other vessels / 2014-10-27 - 2014-12-27 (2 months)
Motorman: Sea Shannon - General cargo / 2018-10-24 - 2019-01-28 (3 months)
Motorman: S.Rafael - Container Ship / 2017-09-26 - 2018-04-25 (7 months)
Wiper : BBC Marmara - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-09-06 - 2017-02-24 (6 months)
Wiper : BBC France - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-05-22 - 2015-12-06 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: BBC Scotland - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-04-13 - 2014-11-07 (7 months)
Oiler: Oya Star - Cement Carrier / 2020-03-04 - 2020-11-22 (9 months)
Oiler: Leptis Star - Cement Carrier / 2019-12-09 - 2020-01-12 (1 month)
Wiper: Leptis Star - Cement Carrier / 2019-04-30 - 2019-12-08 (7 months)
Motorman: Falcon - Tug boat / 2015-12-17 - 2016-03-11 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Dnipro - Passenger vessel / 2014-05-26 - 2014-11-05 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: mv GULF WEST - General cargo / 2018-03-22 - 2018-09-10 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: mv GULF STREAM - General cargo / 2017-05-14 - 2017-12-15 (7 months)
Motorman: mv Minxi - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-05 - 2016-11-06 (6 months)
Oiler: mv ZEYNEP DUNDAR - General cargo / 2015-06-19 - 2015-12-08 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: mv Nadeen - General cargo / 2014-06-28 - 2014-09-23 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Golden bridge - Passenger vessel / 2022-06-30 - 2022-11-07 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Siroco - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-07 - 2021-10-23 (12 months)
3rd Engineer: Puffy - General cargo / 2019-06-28 - 2020-07-03 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: Puffy - General cargo / 2013-11-04 - 2014-04-24 (6 months)
Oiler: BOURBON evolution 804 - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-11-09 - 2021-02-11 (3 months)
Oiler: BOURBON oceanteam 101 - Cable laying vessel / 2020-07-06 - 2020-10-16 (3 months)
Wiper: DUNAY - Dredger / 2020-05-06 - 2020-06-01 (1 month)
Wiper: MSC EDITH - Container Ship / 2019-12-26 - 2020-04-29 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: KHADZHIBEY - Passenger vessel / 2014-01-09 - 2014-03-11 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: City of beijing - Container Ship / 2020-07-21 - 2021-02-15 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: City of beijing - Container Ship / 2018-10-10 - 2019-09-15 (11 months)
Fitter / Welder: City of Shanghai - Container Ship / 2016-10-02 - 2017-09-08 (11 months)
Wiper: M.V EMBDENS WELVAART - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-21 - 2016-02-19 (10 months)
Engine Cadet: M.V CITY OF XIAMEN - Container Ship / 2013-01-29 - 2014-03-06 (1 year)
ETO: x-press kangchenjunga - Container Ship / 2021-08-01 - 2022-02-08 (6 months)
ETO: Sungari - General cargo / 2020-08-04 - 2021-04-04 (8 months)
Electric Cadet: Ministr Ishkov - Fishing vessel / 2015-05-18 - 2015-12-20 (7 months)
Electric Cadet: Eysk - RO-RO / 2014-01-19 - 2014-03-18 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Eysk - RO-RO / 2013-10-19 - 2014-01-18 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Zapolyarye - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-14 - 2019-02-23 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Marshal Vasilevsky - Tug boat / 2016-03-15 - 2017-11-22 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: MB-1214 - Tug boat / 2014-07-24 - 2016-04-21 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: Mekhanik Pyatlin - Dry Cargo / 2013-07-08 - 2013-12-27 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Mekhanik Kraskovskiy - Dry Cargo / 2012-12-17 - 2013-02-18 (2 months)
Motorman: m/t Pallas Glory - Chemical tanker / 2018-07-31 - 2018-11-02 (3 months)
Motorman: f/t Ieva Simonaityte - Fishing vessel / 2016-08-15 - 2017-01-18 (5 months)
Wiper: m/t Birgit Knutsen - Chemical tanker / 2014-08-31 - 2014-12-11 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: m/t Mare Baltic - Chemical tanker / 2013-05-31 - 2013-12-07 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: m/v VITA - General cargo / 2012-06-13 - 2012-10-02 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Helene J - Container Ship / 2013-06-25 - 2013-12-01 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: M\V "Madura" - Container Ship / 2012-07-20 - 2013-01-29 (6 months)
Wiper: MV Federal Island - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-13 - 2020-07-31 (1 year)
Wiper: MV Paradise Island - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-20 - 2018-08-16 (10 months)
Oiler: LCT ASC Lara - Landing Craft / 2015-10-16 - 2016-04-01 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MV Lite Ferry 8 - Passenger vessel / 2012-11-11 - 2013-11-21 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: Saint Nektaris - Bulk Carrier / 2016-09-21 - 2016-12-17 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: ALTENAVI - Dry Cargo / 2015-09-25 - 2016-02-03 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: ALTENAVI - Dry Cargo / 2015-07-01 - 2015-09-25 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Suzie-Q - Dry Cargo / 2013-07-11 - 2013-11-20 (4 months)
Oiler: M/V Pengalia - Container Ship / 2019-11-27 - 2020-11-16 (12 months)
Oiler: M/V Diana J - Container Ship / 2016-09-24 - 2017-09-24 (1 year)
Wiper: M/V Corona J - Container Ship / 2015-02-06 - 2015-07-03 (5 months)
Wiper: M/V Marchaser - Container Ship / 2014-08-06 - 2015-01-12 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: M/V Malte Rambow - Container Ship / 2012-11-06 - 2013-11-16 (1 year)
OOW Engine: Kapitan Lobanov - Fishing vessel / 2021-12-21 - 2024-02-05 (2 years)
OOW Engine: Nerva - Fishing vessel / 2017-12-05 - 2021-12-05 (4 years)
Motorman: Taganrogskiy Zaliv - Reefer / 2015-11-19 - 2016-05-24 (6 months)
Motorman: Forline 1 - Reefer / 2014-10-17 - 2015-03-11 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Sara - General cargo / 2013-05-04 - 2013-11-01 (6 months)
Trainee Engineer: Coral Ivory - LPG / LNG / 2020-02-21 - 2020-06-23 (4 months)
Trainee Engineer: CLIPPER TALENT - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-19 - 2019-06-21 (6 months)
Motorman: Alexander Obukhov - NAVY / 2017-01-20 - 2018-09-14 (1 year)
Motorman: KRUZENSHTERN - Training Ship / 2015-07-21 - 2015-11-10 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: KRUZENSHTERN - Training Ship / 2013-07-01 - 2013-10-29 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Torex - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-04-13 - 2024-06-15 (2 months)
4th Engineer: Liberti - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-06-02 - 2023-11-02 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Oracle - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-18 - 2022-09-18 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Ostrov Sakhalin - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-10 - 2021-11-02 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Hawk Bay - Reefer / 2013-05-14 - 2013-10-03 (5 months)
4th Engineer: San Diego - Reefer / 2017-09-16 - 2018-04-26 (7 months)
4th Engineer: San Diego - Reefer / 2016-12-07 - 2017-04-07 (4 months)
Motorman: Nerey - Reefer / 2016-03-14 - 2016-07-18 (4 months)
Motorman: Progress - Reefer / 2015-05-28 - 2015-09-22 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Vladimir Maysnikov - General cargo / 2013-06-22 - 2013-09-15 (3 months)