Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: M.V London courage - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-30 - 2018-06-03 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: MT ACROPOLIS - Chemical tanker / 2017-07-16 - 2018-01-10 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Mv jabal ali 7 - RO-RO / 2020-10-28 - 2020-12-31 (2 months)
4th Engineer: Mv movers - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-31 - 2020-08-24 (10 months)
Engine Cadet: Mv jabal ali 7 - RO-RO / 2016-07-02 - 2017-02-01 (7 months)
Engineer Assistant: AIDA IV - Passenger vessel / 2020-09-21 - 2021-02-25 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: AIDA IV - Passenger vessel / 2015-08-09 - 2016-02-25 (7 months)
Motorman: Vancouver - General cargo / 2017-03-08 - 2017-04-21 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Universal Baltimore - Bulk Carrier / 2015-05-15 - 2015-12-15 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: SYMPHONY - General cargo / 2015-02-21 - 2015-07-08 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: AHTS Hamed Glory - AHTS / 2014-08-10 - 2014-12-28 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: volgo-balt 206 - General cargo / 2012-10-11 - 2013-03-12 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: ВМ-5 - Other vessels / 2008-09-12 - 2009-01-15 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Керченский-2 - Ferry / 2008-03-02 - 2008-05-09 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: - - LPG / LNG / 1998-12-22 - 1998-12-22 (0 days)
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience