Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
4th Engineer: Fellowship - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-24 - 2021-09-04 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Partnership - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-28 - 2020-09-12 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Leadership - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-29 - 2019-09-26 (6 months)
Motorman: KAPITAN NEZAVITIN - Tug boat / 2017-08-01 - 2018-02-02 (6 months)
Motorman: VAYGACH - Icebreaker / 2023-07-12 - 2024-02-28 (8 months)
Motorman: VAYGACH - Icebreaker / 2022-12-10 - 2023-03-21 (3 months)
Wiper: BBC Volga - General cargo / 2021-09-24 - 2022-03-25 (6 months)
Wiper: Kurt Paul - General cargo / 2020-03-18 - 2021-02-25 (11 months)
Engine Cadet: Kurt Paul - General cargo / 2019-04-09 - 2019-09-25 (6 months)
Pumpman: GASCHEM WESER - LPG / LNG / 2024-07-06 - 2024-07-27 (1 month)
Pumpman: Gaz Venture - LPG / LNG / 2021-11-16 - 2022-02-03 (3 months)
Pumpman: Gaz Fraternity - LPG / LNG / 2020-12-28 - 2021-04-10 (3 months)
Pumpman: Gaz Serenity - LPG / LNG / 2020-11-17 - 2020-12-05 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Kapitan Sukhondyayevskiy - Fishing vessel / 2019-04-30 - 2019-09-22 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Veter - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-08-17 - 2023-04-04 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Orion - Shuttle Tanker / 2021-07-09 - 2022-03-05 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Gas Zeus - LPG / LNG / 2020-07-04 - 2021-02-09 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: BBC Seine - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-02-23 - 2019-09-15 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: ATHOS - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-29 - 2021-10-20 (9 months)
Oiler: ATHOS - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-23 - 2021-01-28 (2 months)
Oiler: Artemissio - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-11 - 2020-07-21 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Ameland - General cargo / 2019-04-09 - 2019-09-13 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Accum - General cargo / 2018-05-09 - 2018-11-09 (6 months)
Oiler: OSPREY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-01-20 - 2023-08-04 (6 months)
Oiler: SPIRIT - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-11-15 - 2023-01-15 (2 months)
Oiler: PELICAN - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-06-18 - 2022-07-29 (1 year)
Wiper: TSAR VLADIMIR - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-11-16 - 2021-04-20 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Credo - Dry Cargo / 2019-07-11 - 2019-09-12 (2 months)
4th Engineer: Cindy - Container Ship / 2023-03-27 - 2023-10-14 (7 months)
Wiper: Imke - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-12-24 - 2022-09-11 (9 months)
Wiper: Sun Bird - General cargo / 2020-01-07 - 2021-02-09 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: Adilia 1 - Container Ship / 2019-01-11 - 2019-09-11 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Warnow Dolphin - Container Ship / 2017-04-02 - 2017-10-27 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Onego Traveller - General cargo / 2022-05-18 - 2022-08-19 (3 months)
Oiler: Renate P/Jona Sophie - Container Ship / 2021-08-20 - 2022-01-04 (4 months)
Motorman: Ara Atlantis - Container Ship / 2020-11-23 - 2021-04-09 (5 months)
Motorman: Ara Atlantis - Container Ship / 2020-02-22 - 2020-07-16 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Samskip Endeavour - Container Ship / 2019-05-10 - 2019-09-06 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: MANZANILLO - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-21 - 2019-09-04 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Not available - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-07 - 2018-12-31 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Not available - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-07 - 2018-01-07 (4 months)
Wiper: Not available - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-07 - 2017-01-04 (7 months)
Engineer Assistant: MT FAXON - Chemical tanker / 2021-08-12 - 2021-08-22 (10 days)
Engineer Assistant: MT Happiness1 - VLCC / 2020-10-28 - 2021-03-02 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: MT DEVON - VLCC / 2019-08-11 - 2019-08-31 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: MT HELM - VLCC / 2019-07-10 - 2019-08-08 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: MT DEVON - VLCC / 2019-03-03 - 2019-05-27 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Bourbon Argos - AHTS / 2021-05-13 - 2021-08-23 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Bourbon Argos - AHTS / 2020-11-11 - 2021-03-12 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Bourbon Liberty 308 - AHTS / 2019-06-08 - 2019-08-29 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Bourbon Liberty 160 - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-06-23 - 2018-08-30 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Bourbon Liberty 319 - AHTS / 2017-07-04 - 2017-09-28 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Viking Drive - RO-RO / 2023-04-05 - 2023-08-26 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Viking Drive - RO-RO / 2021-09-05 - 2022-01-28 (5 months)
4th Engineer: SFL Conductor - RO-RO / 2020-10-12 - 2021-03-24 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Viking Diamond - RO-RO / 2019-10-24 - 2020-02-19 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Viking Coral - RO-RO / 2019-02-20 - 2019-08-19 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Oracle - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-05-15 - 2021-09-17 (4 months)
Trainee Engineer: Karvounis - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-19 - 2020-11-11 (5 months)
Trainee Engineer: Manolates - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-11 - 2020-02-02 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Mariposa - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-04-14 - 2019-08-09 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Papillon - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-02-05 - 2018-09-02 (7 months)
Wiper: Volta - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-29 - 2024-02-27 (6 months)
Wiper: Satori - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-14 - 2022-10-08 (9 months)
Wiper: MOL Emissary - Container Ship / 2020-09-24 - 2021-05-03 (7 months)
Motorman: Porada - General cargo / 2019-08-25 - 2020-02-15 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Tiina Too - Bunkering Vessel / 2019-03-06 - 2019-08-06 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Zourva - VLCC / 2020-12-09 - 2021-04-29 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: M/T ZOURVA - VLCC / 2019-01-20 - 2019-08-02 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MINERVA GRACE - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-02-05 - 2018-07-28 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: AMPHITRITE - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-07-29 - 2016-12-07 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Буксир "Лиман" - Other vessels / 2015-12-30 - 2016-03-02 (2 months)
Motorman: Marguisa Zierikzee - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2022-10-25 - 2023-05-02 (6 months)
Motorman: Jasperland - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-10-15 - 2022-06-27 (8 months)
Motorman: Alice - General cargo / 2020-07-25 - 2021-04-11 (9 months)
Motorman: ASPRO - General cargo / 2019-09-17 - 2020-02-20 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Chelsea 3 - General cargo / 2019-04-23 - 2019-07-30 (3 months)
Wiper : Four sky - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-01-21 - 2019-07-26 (6 months)
Wiper : Four sky - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-02-21 - 2017-08-07 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Four sky - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-02-21 - 2017-08-07 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Prisco elizaveta - Chemical tanker / 2015-05-21 - 2015-09-25 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Prisco alexandra - Chemical tanker / 2014-07-03 - 2014-10-20 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Tb pancaran 1111 - Tug boat / 2022-01-03 - 2022-06-25 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Rika jaya dua - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-03-21 - 2021-12-16 (9 months)
4th Engineer: MT patricia - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-05 - 2020-11-23 (11 months)
Engine Cadet: Pricilia - RO-RO / 2018-07-25 - 2019-07-25 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: СМП АРХАНГЕЛЬСК - General cargo / 2023-09-11 - 2024-04-30 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: СМП АРХАНГЕЛЬСК - General cargo / 2022-10-28 - 2023-05-10 (6 months)
Motorman: СМП АРХАНГЕЛЬСК - General cargo / 2022-01-27 - 2022-08-10 (6 months)
Motorman: Varzuga - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-07-25 - 2020-02-22 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Indiga - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-04-16 - 2019-07-24 (3 months)
Motorman: Либерти - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-12-16 - 2023-03-08 (3 months)
Motorman: CHEROKEE - General cargo / 2022-04-12 - 2022-07-15 (3 months)
Motorman: Volgo-Don 235 - General cargo / 2020-07-22 - 2020-11-29 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: "Anton Chehov" - Passenger vessel / 2019-05-19 - 2019-07-21 (2 months)