Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: Druzhba - Training Ship / 2018-07-16 - 2018-08-26 (1 month)
Oiler: MY Sun glider ll - Yacht / 2019-03-01 - 2019-08-31 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MT Tapilon - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-11-23 - 2017-11-23 (1 year)
Trainee Wiper: Corvo - General cargo / 2017-08-04 - 2017-08-18 (14 days)
Engine Cadet: TMC ANGEL - Other vessels / 2016-08-17 - 2016-11-17 (3 months)
4th Engineer: M.T.LARGO MARINER - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-09 - 2020-09-10 (10 months)
4th Engineer: M.T.GULF DEFFI - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-01-21 - 2018-09-04 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: M.T.ORCHIDS - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-11-18 - 2016-08-12 (9 months)
Wiper : Ertea - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-10 - 2018-03-02 (9 months)
Engine Cadet: Annetta - General cargo / 2015-07-30 - 2015-11-23 (4 months)
Motorman: Koyo Mary - Fishing vessel / 2014-12-13 - 2015-06-18 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MS St Joan Of Arc - Ferry / 2015-09-19 - 2015-09-26 (7 days)
Engine Cadet: Andor - Bulk Carrier / 2015-01-28 - 2015-02-28 (1 month)
3rd Engineer: AZIMUTH - Passenger vessel / 2018-08-12 - 2018-09-25 (1 month)
4th Engineer: ANTONIS A. ANGELICOUSSIS - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-04 - 2018-08-07 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: ALPHA VISION - Bulk Carrier / 2014-08-14 - 2015-01-15 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: MARIA A. ANGELICOUSSIS - Bulk Carrier / 2013-02-23 - 2013-09-21 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: BALTIC QUEEN - Passenger vessel / 2013-10-09 - 2013-10-23 (14 days)
Engine Cadet: DISTINTO - General cargo / 2012-05-16 - 2012-08-04 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: SILJA FESTIVAL - Passenger vessel / 2012-04-19 - 2012-05-01 (12 days)
Motorman: Peterpaul - Chemical tanker / 2011-04-02 - 2011-10-12 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Kaltene - Chemical tanker / 2009-02-06 - 2009-06-11 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Evidence - Container Ship / 2012-05-11 - 2012-10-26 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Onego St. Petersburg - Bulk Carrier / 2011-08-06 - 2012-02-25 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Birgit G. - Bulk Carrier / 2010-07-07 - 2011-03-11 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Marcajama, ex name Delmas Leixoes - Container Ship / 2008-05-06 - 2008-11-04 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: CAP George - Container Ship / 2011-05-26 - 2011-09-17 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: CAP George - Container Ship / 2010-09-24 - 2011-01-24 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Cathrine Rickmers - Container Ship / 2009-11-09 - 2010-04-04 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: BORDER - Container Ship / 2009-01-22 - 2009-06-06 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: SANTIAGO - Container Ship / 2008-04-15 - 2008-10-16 (6 months)
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience