Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Trinity Glory - LPG / LNG / 2023-01-25 - 2023-08-19 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Al Ghariya - LPG / LNG / 2021-06-01 - 2021-12-25 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Coral Acropora - LPG / LNG / 2019-08-31 - 2020-01-10 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Coral Palmata - LPG / LNG / 2018-02-23 - 2018-08-17 (6 months)
3rd Officer: MSC ANNAMARIA - Container Ship / 2024-01-19 - 2024-04-05 (3 months)
3rd Officer: MSC ANNAMARIA - Container Ship / 2022-10-09 - 2023-04-20 (6 months)
AB Seaman: MAERSK GUATEMALA - Container Ship / 2021-06-04 - 2022-02-23 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: SHEILA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-01 - 2020-01-09 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: LEFKONIKO - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-03 - 2019-03-02 (6 months)
OS: BBC London - General cargo / 2022-10-10 - 2023-02-14 (4 months)
OS: Ditzum - General cargo / 2022-03-19 - 2022-09-16 (6 months)
OS: Ostermarsch - General cargo / 2021-03-30 - 2021-10-14 (6 months)
OS: Ostermarsch - General cargo / 2020-05-11 - 2020-11-09 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Ostermarsch - General cargo / 2019-06-16 - 2019-12-24 (6 months)
OS: ANNALISA P - Container Ship / 2021-07-16 - 2022-02-23 (7 months)
OS: Leonie P - Container Ship / 2020-09-04 - 2021-02-21 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Warnow Mars - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-04-17 - 2019-12-16 (8 months)
OS: Neptune Kefalonia - RO-RO / 2022-02-11 - 2022-09-03 (7 months)
OS: Norrland - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-05-05 - 2021-10-08 (5 months)
Tanker Chartering Trainee: Norrland - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-04-05 - 2021-05-04 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: m/v Excellent, RoRo Cargo Ship, Valletta - RO-RO / 2019-09-22 - 2019-12-16 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: b / c Docker - Tug boat / 2019-06-24 - 2019-08-27 (2 months)
3rd Officer: H&S Wisdom - Dry Cargo / 2022-10-18 - 2022-12-18 (2 months)
3rd Officer: H&S Prudence - General cargo / 2022-06-09 - 2022-09-17 (3 months)
OS: Uniscout - Dry Cargo / 2021-06-29 - 2022-01-11 (6 months)
OS: Maria Francisca - Container Ship / 2020-09-18 - 2021-02-27 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Flex Emden - Dry Cargo / 2019-05-10 - 2019-10-27 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: WL TOTMA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-02 - 2019-10-18 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2018-04-15 - 2018-11-15 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2017-07-05 - 2017-09-30 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Bright - Container Ship / 2021-06-12 - 2021-11-15 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Winner - Container Ship / 2020-06-21 - 2020-11-24 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Letavia - Container Ship / 2019-03-17 - 2019-09-12 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Cochrane - Container Ship / 2017-03-05 - 2017-09-05 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Cochrane - Container Ship / 2016-01-12 - 2016-07-20 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Afanasiy Matyushenko - General cargo / 2023-06-29 - 2023-11-19 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Global Carrier - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-04-30 - 2021-06-25 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Fleet Leader - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-05-10 - 2020-09-19 (4 months)
Junior officer: Fleet Leader - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-03-11 - 2020-05-09 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Global Carrier - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-01-21 - 2019-09-05 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Orient tide - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-28 - 2024-01-11 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Ponente - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-15 - 2022-12-03 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Inspecta7 - AHTS / 2019-03-15 - 2019-08-26 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Aida iv - Other vessels / 2018-09-15 - 2019-03-07 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Ciudad Autonoma Melilla - Ferry / 2019-03-11 - 2019-08-09 (5 months)
Stewardess: Formentera Direct - Ferry / 2016-07-17 - 2016-09-16 (2 months)
Stewardess: Formentera Direct - Ferry / 2016-03-14 - 2016-05-26 (2 months)
Stewardess: Volcan de Tinamar - Ferry / 2015-07-03 - 2015-09-06 (2 months)
OS: YASHMA - Dry Cargo / 2022-10-06 - 2023-02-05 (4 months)
OS: RUSICH-11 - General cargo / 2021-05-06 - 2021-09-08 (4 months)
OS: МБ-1204 - Tug boat / 2020-07-09 - 2020-10-24 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2019-04-25 - 2019-07-08 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Oleg tavolzhanskiy - General cargo / 2021-04-07 - 2021-08-07 (4 months)
OS: Victor Konetsky - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-02-23 - 2020-07-08 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Victor Konetsky - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-01-07 - 2019-05-02 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Thisseas - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-09 - 2022-06-09 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Thisseas - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-01 - 2021-04-15 (7 months)
OS: Hercules - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-19 - 2020-02-04 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Aeneas - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-01 - 2019-03-31 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Baltic Prince - Reefer / 2018-11-28 - 2019-03-22 (4 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Baltic Prince - Reefer / 2017-10-28 - 2018-05-31 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Volgoneft-165 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-05-21 - 2015-11-08 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Energy Pride - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-08-07 - 2013-02-15 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Fleet Star - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-01-15 - 2019-02-09 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Ocean Energy - Heavy lift vessel / 2018-10-03 - 2019-01-15 (3 months)
OS: Steffi C - General cargo / 2016-09-07 - 2017-04-28 (8 months)
OS: "Maliy B.S." - Dry Cargo / 2020-11-25 - 2021-05-15 (6 months)
OS: Sea Hellinis - RO-RO / 2020-01-08 - 2020-07-14 (6 months)
OS: m/v Global Carrier - RO-RO / 2019-07-19 - 2019-10-11 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v Fleet Star - RO-RO / 2018-10-05 - 2019-02-07 (4 months)
OS: m/v Glory - Container Ship / 2017-10-01 - 2018-05-21 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: ZIM Shekou - Container Ship / 2018-06-22 - 2019-01-10 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v Tatarbunary - General cargo / 2017-10-02 - 2017-12-15 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Portovij-26 - Tug boat / 2017-07-10 - 2017-08-06 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Alpine Amalia - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-08-28 - 2022-03-20 (7 months)
3rd Officer: OCEAN SPIRIT - Chemical tanker / 2020-08-13 - 2021-03-20 (7 months)
AB Seaman: OCEAN SPIRIT - Chemical tanker / 2020-06-12 - 2020-08-12 (2 months)
OS: OCEAN SPIRIT - Chemical tanker / 2019-01-25 - 2019-09-21 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: STENAWECO VENTURE - Chemical tanker / 2018-02-20 - 2018-09-13 (7 months)
OS: Kentavr - Tug boat / 2020-08-25 - 2020-09-26 (1 month)
Steward: Magellan - Cruise Liner / 2019-12-04 - 2020-06-13 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Granite - Tug boat / 2018-08-01 - 2018-08-31 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Bugaz - Tug boat / 2016-06-20 - 2016-08-20 (2 months)