Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: DRUZHBA - Sailing Vessel / 2019-08-05 - 2019-09-01 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Martyn Latsis - General cargo / 2018-11-08 - 2019-05-20 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: STS ,,MIR” - Training Ship / 2018-06-06 - 2018-09-09 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: MSC Atlantic - Container Ship / 2018-01-21 - 2018-07-22 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: MSC Pilar - Container Ship / 2016-02-21 - 2016-09-27 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Tigris - Other vessels / 2015-04-27 - 2015-08-02 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Hadjibey - Passenger vessel / 2014-05-30 - 2014-08-31 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Training Ship / 2018-04-21 - 2018-06-21 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: ZIAD JUNIOR - General cargo / 2016-07-19 - 2018-02-26 (1 year)
2nd Officer: CY INTEROCEAN I - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-01-07 - 2023-09-17 (2 years)
Chief Officer: CY INTEROCEAN I - Heavy lift vessel / 2022-12-27 - 2023-08-02 (7 months)
2nd Officer: CY INTEROCEAN I - Heavy lift vessel / 2022-03-24 - 2022-10-27 (7 months)
3rd Officer: CY INTEROCEAN II - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-11-29 - 2020-11-05 (11 months)
Deck Cadet: GAS VENUS - LPG / LNG / 2017-08-04 - 2017-12-24 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: STS Mir - Training Ship / 2017-10-01 - 2017-11-30 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: lady safia 1 - General cargo / 2016-11-01 - 2017-10-21 (12 months)
Deck Cadet: SPIRIT OF SINGAPORE - Container Ship / 2017-03-29 - 2017-08-16 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: spirit of hamburg - Container Ship / 2015-11-24 - 2016-02-12 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: REGIONAL MARITIME UNIVERSITY - Bulk Carrier / 2015-08-02 - 2017-07-22 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: OM-106 - Passenger vessel / 2017-06-19 - 2017-07-14 (1 month)
Motorman: Silver lion - Dry Cargo / 2017-01-01 - 2017-05-02 (4 months)
Motorman: Silver Lion - Dry Cargo / 2017-01-01 - 2017-05-01 (4 months)
Motorman: Astrahan-1 - Crane vessel / 2016-09-01 - 2016-12-07 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: SKIF-V - General cargo / 2016-06-01 - 2016-10-28 (5 months)
Motorman: Adventure II - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-06 - 2018-12-01 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Sea Discovery - General cargo / 2017-03-03 - 2017-07-30 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Oslo Carrier 2 - General cargo / 2016-05-17 - 2016-10-26 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Виктори - Other vessels / 2016-07-18 - 2016-09-19 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Sabuk Nusantara 109 - Passenger vessel / 2021-10-02 - 2023-04-18 (1 year)
3rd Officer: Sabuk Nusantara 109 - Passenger vessel / 2019-12-07 - 2021-10-01 (1 year)
1st Officer: Hai Ian Oil 621 - Tug boat / 2018-07-30 - 2019-01-03 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: MV EGON - RO-RO / 2015-08-13 - 2016-08-18 (1 year)
OS: VENATOR - General cargo / 2017-09-25 - 2018-01-20 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: INGULETS - Other vessels / 2015-07-01 - 2015-08-31 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Grandi navi veloci - Passenger vessel / 2015-02-12 - 2015-02-15 (3 days)