Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Atlantic Lady - Reefer / 2020-04-30 - 2020-08-26 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Atlantic Lady - Reefer / 2019-06-05 - 2019-11-09 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Noviy Svet - Reefer / 2018-11-17 - 2019-04-30 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Solombala - Fishing vessel / 2018-04-10 - 2018-08-31 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Santana - Fishing vessel / 2017-07-31 - 2018-04-09 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: RAINBOW-9 - Crew boat / 2019-08-15 - 2019-10-17 (2 months)
OS: Maral - Other vessels / 2020-03-25 - 2020-10-09 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: MB-1205 - Tug boat / 2019-05-07 - 2019-08-21 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: MV SEA SHARK - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-27 - 2019-08-19 (11 months)
Deck Cadet: Кристоф де Маржери - LPG / LNG / 2019-06-06 - 2019-08-13 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Лиговский Проспект - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-07-18 - 2018-09-20 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Valerii Platonov - Dry Cargo / 2019-03-03 - 2019-05-30 (3 months)
OS: Seven Seas - General cargo / 2019-05-08 - 2019-09-11 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Kapitan Nezavitin - Tug boat / 2018-10-02 - 2019-04-30 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Kentavt - Tug boat / 2017-05-22 - 2017-07-24 (2 months)
OS: Фрегат 1го ранга "Адмирал Горшков" - General cargo / 2016-04-18 - 2019-04-17 (2 years)
Crane Operator: MSC BELLE - Container Ship / 2021-08-13 - 2021-11-24 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Reina - General cargo / 2018-05-07 - 2018-10-28 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: VITA - General cargo / 2018-04-23 - 2018-10-26 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Hosei 18 - General cargo / 2017-06-21 - 2017-11-17 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Ocean Energy - RO-RO / 2018-04-03 - 2018-10-06 (6 months)
OS: MSC Nederland - Container Ship / 2020-10-14 - 2020-12-04 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Scf alpine - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-04-19 - 2018-09-17 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Viktor Bakaev - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-02-04 - 2018-08-16 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Konak - General cargo / 2017-09-25 - 2018-03-26 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Evagoras - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-03-17 - 2022-04-27 (1 month)
3rd Officer: DHT HAWK - VLCC / 2021-03-30 - 2021-10-06 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Promoter - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-12-30 - 2021-02-13 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Prometheus light - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-09-26 - 2020-06-30 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Ridgebury Pride - VLCC / 2017-01-24 - 2017-12-23 (11 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Training Ship / 2017-07-05 - 2017-09-30 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Artey - General cargo / 2017-02-20 - 2017-04-23 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Mv. Navdhenu sun - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-23 - 2020-07-13 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Mv.TCI PRABHU - General cargo / 2016-09-01 - 2017-04-06 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Mv.TCI SURYA - General cargo / 2015-12-07 - 2016-06-02 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: OM-106 - Passenger vessel / 2016-06-07 - 2016-08-31 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Ocean Victory - General cargo / 2015-10-08 - 2016-02-25 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Anna Barbara - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-12 - 2015-09-15 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Kentavr - Other vessels / 2014-05-14 - 2014-08-31 (4 months)