Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Officer: Anwaar al Khalij - Chemical tanker / 2017-06-26 - 2017-09-24 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Taibah - Chemical tanker / 2016-12-16 - 2017-05-16 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Hafnia Soya - Chemical tanker / 2016-05-01 - 2016-09-13 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Seychelles Pioneer - Chemical tanker / 2015-09-04 - 2016-01-13 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Oralynn - Chemical tanker / 2015-05-04 - 2015-07-23 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Volga 4007 - General cargo / 2017-01-06 - 2017-07-27 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Volga 4007 - General cargo / 2016-05-24 - 2016-11-17 (6 months)
Master: Natali - General cargo / 2016-06-01 - 2016-09-30 (4 months)
Master: Natali - General cargo / 2014-06-06 - 2014-10-10 (4 months)
Master: Chalna - General cargo / 2013-11-17 - 2014-04-09 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Rainbow - General cargo / 2016-11-07 - 2017-06-06 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Rainbow - General cargo / 2015-08-04 - 2016-04-17 (8 months)
Chief Officer: dorothea - Bulk Carrier / 2014-09-20 - 2015-04-28 (7 months)
Chief Officer: galisa - General cargo / 2013-10-29 - 2014-05-17 (7 months)
Chief Officer: amur - Dry Cargo / 2013-01-21 - 2013-06-05 (4 months)
Chief Officer: MARTIN - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-21 - 2017-04-29 (4 months)
Chief Officer: VENTURE JOY - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-14 - 2016-08-28 (4 months)
Chief Officer: DEFIANT - Bulk Carrier / 2015-06-01 - 2015-12-21 (7 months)
Chief Officer: MARE DORO (SHIP SOLD) - Bulk Carrier / 2014-10-06 - 2014-11-23 (2 months)
2nd Officer: MARE DORO - Bulk Carrier / 2014-07-15 - 2014-10-06 (3 months)
Chief Officer: MSC Ishyka - Container Ship / 2016-12-02 - 2017-04-14 (4 months)
Chief Officer: MSC Lucia - Container Ship / 2016-01-25 - 2016-06-22 (5 months)
Chief Officer: MSC Agata - Container Ship / 2015-04-02 - 2015-10-07 (6 months)
2nd Officer: MSC Jasmine - Container Ship / 2014-04-04 - 2014-09-25 (6 months)
2nd Officer: MSC Pilar - Container Ship / 2013-02-07 - 2013-08-31 (7 months)
Chief Officer: M/T Leon - Bunkering Vessel / 2016-12-14 - 2017-04-10 (4 months)
2nd Officer: M/T Ice Hawk - Chemical tanker / 2016-02-18 - 2016-09-05 (7 months)
2nd Officer: M/T Ice Hawk - Chemical tanker / 2015-01-19 - 2015-10-03 (8 months)
2nd Officer: M/T Ice Hawk - Chemical tanker / 2013-11-10 - 2014-04-16 (5 months)
3rd Officer: M/T Ice Hawk - Chemical tanker / 2013-06-26 - 2013-11-10 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Umgeni - Chemical tanker / 2016-12-01 - 2017-03-27 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Rhino - Chemical tanker / 2015-12-11 - 2016-04-30 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Lavela - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-12-04 - 2015-02-21 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Leopard Sea - Chemical tanker / 2014-10-03 - 2014-11-28 (2 months)
Chief Officer: ARKAIM-7 - General cargo / 2016-08-05 - 2016-12-01 (4 months)
Chief Officer: ARKAIM-4 - General cargo / 2016-01-28 - 2016-04-28 (3 months)
Chief Officer: ARKAIM-4 - General cargo / 2015-03-28 - 2015-06-21 (3 months)
Chief Officer: WIZARD - Dry Cargo / 2013-02-22 - 2014-09-04 (1 year)
Chief Officer: Arkaim-5 - General cargo / 2013-04-29 - 2013-08-12 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Halul 24 - AHTS / 2016-07-20 - 2016-11-23 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Halul 24 - AHTS / 2016-01-10 - 2016-04-04 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Al Huwaila - DSV (Diving Support) / 2015-08-29 - 2015-12-03 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Al Huwailla - DSV (Diving Support) / 2015-03-05 - 2015-06-07 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Al Huwailla - DSV (Diving Support) / 2014-11-05 - 2015-01-30 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Simone - VLCC / 2015-12-03 - 2016-02-29 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Felicity - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-03-13 - 2015-07-25 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Neptun - VLCC / 2014-09-23 - 2015-01-05 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Nectar - VLCC / 2014-07-03 - 2014-07-28 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Maersk Nectar - VLCC / 2014-05-10 - 2014-07-02 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Cristina - General cargo / 2015-06-10 - 2015-09-03 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Zheng Yang - General cargo / 2014-12-21 - 2015-04-23 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Triple S - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-04-01 - 2014-10-10 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Rekefjord Stone - General cargo / 2013-09-13 - 2013-11-28 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Rekefjord Stone - General cargo / 2013-04-24 - 2013-07-12 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Zamil-55 - AHTS / 2014-09-19 - 2015-01-16 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Zamil-58 - AHTS / 2014-04-04 - 2014-08-12 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Zamil-54 - AHTS / 2013-09-30 - 2014-01-30 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Zamil-56 - AHTS / 2013-05-24 - 2013-08-25 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Zamil-52 - AHTS / 2013-01-03 - 2013-03-19 (3 months)
Master: Northern Valence - Container Ship / 2014-10-02 - 2015-01-23 (4 months)
Master: Northern Valence - Container Ship / 2014-04-27 - 2014-08-01 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Northern Valence - Container Ship / 2014-04-01 - 2014-04-27 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Northern Diamond - Container Ship / 2013-08-28 - 2014-01-15 (5 months)
Chief Officer: NORTHERN VALENCE - Container Ship / 2013-02-16 - 2013-07-11 (5 months)
Barge Master: Catarina - Semi-submersible platform / 2019-12-05 - 2021-02-26 (1 year)
Master: Brava Star - Drilling vessel / 2014-03-21 - 2019-03-19 (4 years)
Chief Officer: Lewek Crusader - Construction vessel / 2013-07-26 - 2014-03-11 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Sapura 3000 - Pipe laying vessel / 2012-08-22 - 2013-07-04 (10 months)
Chief Officer: ODN II - Drilling vessel / 2011-09-23 - 2012-08-08 (11 months)
Master: African Vision - MRSV / 2014-12-14 - 2017-11-21 (2 years)
Superintendant: - - AHTS / 2014-06-30 - 2014-09-30 (3 months)
Master: Rem Supplier - Offshore Supply vessel / 2014-03-12 - 2014-05-11 (2 months)
Chief Officer: African Vision - MRSV / 2013-06-01 - 2013-07-04 (1 month)
Chief Officer: African Vision - MRSV / 2013-03-23 - 2013-04-27 (1 month)
Chief Officer: A.H.Paraggi - AHTS / 2013-03-01 - 2013-05-31 (3 months)
Chief Officer: A.H.Paraggi - AHTS / 2012-11-02 - 2013-01-08 (2 months)
Chief Officer: A.H.Paraggi - AHTS / 2012-08-02 - 2012-10-10 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Bonassola - Offshore Supply vessel / 2011-12-04 - 2012-02-18 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Bonassola - Offshore Supply vessel / 2011-08-22 - 2011-10-28 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Aviona - Bulk Carrier / 2012-09-11 - 2013-01-26 (4 months)
Chief Officer: L. Karastoyanova - Bulk Carrier / 2012-02-07 - 2012-06-27 (5 months)
Chief Officer: San Marini - Coaster / 2011-04-23 - 2011-08-08 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Don Star - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2010-10-11 - 2011-01-15 (3 months)
Chief Officer: S. Rudnev - Bulk Carrier / 2009-12-25 - 2010-07-06 (6 months)
Master: RBD Jutlandia - Container Ship / 2013-01-27 - 2013-06-25 (5 months)
Master: Jackeline-H - Container Ship / 2012-07-11 - 2012-11-19 (4 months)
Chief Officer: RBD Esperanza - Container Ship / 2011-10-04 - 2012-03-01 (5 months)
Chief Officer: RBD Jutlandia - Container Ship / 2011-04-17 - 2011-08-21 (4 months)
Chief Officer: RBD Jutlandia - Container Ship / 2010-09-18 - 2010-12-15 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Seaways Montauk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2024-05-30 - 2024-10-01 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Seaways Montauk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-07-18 - 2023-12-14 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Seaways Montauk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-10-09 - 2023-03-02 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Seaways Montauk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-10-16 - 2022-04-30 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Seaways Montauk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-10-29 - 2021-03-30 (5 months)
Chief Officer: MV MSC JENNY II - Container Ship / 2024-07-21 - 2024-08-06 (1 month)
Chief Officer: MV PARIN - Bulk Carrier / 2024-04-04 - 2024-05-20 (2 months)
Chief Officer: MV BEHNAVAZ - Container Ship / 2023-06-06 - 2023-11-13 (5 months)
Chief Officer: MV NESHAT - General cargo / 2023-04-04 - 2023-06-04 (2 months)
Chief Officer: MV ARTIN - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-01 - 2022-12-07 (5 months)