Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Officer: SOPHIA - Container Ship / 2016-11-23 - 2017-03-21 (4 months)
Chief Officer: JONNI RITSCHER - Container Ship / 2015-11-19 - 2016-04-04 (5 months)
Chief Officer: DOLPHIN STRAIT - Container Ship / 2015-03-04 - 2015-07-24 (5 months)
Chief Officer: CONTI HARMONY - Container Ship / 2011-04-22 - 2014-07-16 (3 years)
Chief Officer: KIL-31 - Other vessels / 2019-09-26 - 2024-09-25 (4 years)
Chief Officer: GTM Denmark - Chemical tanker / 2024-03-29 - 2024-06-30 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Aster Alvar - Chemical tanker / 2023-10-05 - 2023-12-19 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Aster Alvar - Chemical tanker / 2023-05-06 - 2023-08-05 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Aster Alvar - Chemical tanker / 2022-12-04 - 2023-02-20 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Aster Alvar - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-06-21 - 2022-09-19 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Temiro - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-09-19 - 2024-02-16 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Sunny Isles - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-09-03 - 2023-02-21 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Sunny Isles - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-08-16 - 2022-03-20 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Ripley Pioneer - Bulk Carrier / 2023-11-11 - 2024-02-09 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Alpha Discovery - Bulk Carrier / 2023-04-08 - 2023-07-20 (3 months)
Chief Officer: LMZ BIANCA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-28 - 2023-03-03 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Mystras - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-30 - 2022-04-14 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Kedros - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-26 - 2021-04-27 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Emstal - General cargo / 2023-08-27 - 2024-01-14 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Emstal - General cargo / 2022-11-01 - 2023-04-30 (6 months)
2nd Officer: RMS Twisteden - Dry Cargo / 2021-08-22 - 2022-06-09 (10 months)
2nd Officer: Wilson Odra - Dry Cargo / 2019-10-10 - 2021-04-07 (1 year)
Chief Officer: MARGUERITA - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-30 - 2024-01-11 (4 months)
Chief Officer: HARVESTER - Bulk Carrier / 2023-02-24 - 2023-04-21 (2 months)
Chief Officer: HARVESTER - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-13 - 2022-10-15 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Four Turandot - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-15 - 2022-02-27 (4 months)
Chief Officer: HARVESTER - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-10 - 2021-03-26 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Nikolay Kuznetsov - Dry Cargo / 2023-07-10 - 2024-01-05 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Volgo-Balt 235 - General cargo / 2020-12-29 - 2021-05-27 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Nikolay Kuznetsov - General cargo / 2020-07-06 - 2020-11-16 (4 months)
Chief Officer: DANUBE RIVER - LPG / LNG / 2023-08-04 - 2023-12-15 (4 months)
Chief Officer: CHESHIRE - LPG / LNG / 2021-12-08 - 2022-05-04 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Hampshire - LPG / LNG / 2020-07-18 - 2021-05-07 (10 months)
Chief Officer: Cheshire - LPG / LNG / 2019-07-20 - 2019-10-15 (3 months)
2nd Officer: CHESHIRE - LPG / LNG / 2019-06-20 - 2019-07-20 (1 month)
Chief Officer: NIPAYIA - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-07-09 - 2023-11-24 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Ariadne - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-25 - 2022-11-24 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Afrodite - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-11 - 2022-01-06 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Sunny Isles - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-27 - 2021-02-07 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Pyxis Epsilon - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-06-15 - 2019-12-16 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Situla - Survey vessel / 2023-07-21 - 2023-11-21 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Stefany - General cargo / 2022-02-15 - 2022-08-28 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Swissco Garnet - AHT / 2020-02-26 - 2020-11-26 (9 months)
Chief Officer: Med Surveyor - Survey vessel / 2019-03-19 - 2019-09-17 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Med Surveyor - Survey vessel / 2018-08-04 - 2019-02-08 (6 months)
Chief Officer: VOLKHOV - Reefer / 2023-02-23 - 2023-05-22 (3 months)
2nd Officer: VOLKHOV - Reefer / 2022-11-15 - 2023-02-22 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Zaliv Prostor - Reefer / 2019-12-13 - 2020-06-27 (6 months)
Junior officer: Yara Freya - LPG / LNG / 2019-09-17 - 2019-10-15 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Korsakov - Reefer / 2019-01-12 - 2019-05-21 (4 months)
Chief Officer: KRISTIN - General cargo / 2022-06-09 - 2022-10-06 (4 months)
Chief Officer: CARLOW - Dry Cargo / 2021-08-07 - 2022-02-15 (6 months)
2nd Officer: KAIE - Dry Cargo / 2020-12-08 - 2021-03-09 (3 months)
2nd Officer: KAIE - Dry Cargo / 2020-01-22 - 2020-06-28 (5 months)
Master: Miriam B - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-11-25 - 2023-03-31 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Miriam B - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-01-02 - 2022-09-28 (9 months)
Chief Officer: Miriam B - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-06-03 - 2021-09-28 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Rich Breeze - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-10 - 2020-07-07 (7 months)
Chief Officer: FRONT PRINCESS - VLCC / 2022-05-10 - 2022-09-14 (4 months)
Chief Officer: FRONT EARL - VLCC / 2021-07-29 - 2021-11-02 (3 months)
Chief Officer: ECO SEAS - VLCC / 2020-11-20 - 2021-03-09 (4 months)
Master: EPICURUS - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-18 - 2020-05-13 (4 months)
Chief Officer: EPICURUS - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-27 - 2020-01-17 (1 month)
Chief Officer: LADY HAYAT - General cargo / 2022-04-13 - 2022-08-16 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Delta Apollonia - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-09-19 - 2022-05-02 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Explorer - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-01-16 - 2021-06-16 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Prosky - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-14 - 2020-11-23 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Sounion - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-07-10 - 2019-11-29 (5 months)
Chief Officer: HS Tosca - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-04-29 - 2018-09-15 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Ammon - Coaster / 2021-11-24 - 2022-03-24 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Ammon - Coaster / 2021-03-03 - 2021-09-14 (6 months)
2nd Officer: MPV Everest - Construction vessel / 2020-08-06 - 2020-11-10 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Topaz Belaya - General cargo / 2020-03-15 - 2020-07-09 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Topaz Belaya - General cargo / 2020-01-10 - 2020-02-22 (1 month)
2nd Officer: EVROS - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-30 - 2021-12-14 (5 months)
2nd Officer: ALFIOS - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-14 - 2021-01-14 (5 months)
2nd Officer: SESTREA - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-08-18 - 2018-12-17 (4 months)
2nd Officer: AEGEA - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-12-16 - 2018-05-15 (5 months)
2nd Officer: ALTHEA - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-06-03 - 2017-09-12 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Nimbus Spb - Bunkering Vessel / 2017-05-09 - 2021-11-26 (4 years)
Chief Officer: Nimbus Spb - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-04-02 - 2017-05-08 (3 years)