Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
ETO: CMA GSM Maupasant - Container Ship / 2020-06-10 - 2020-11-13 (5 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: CMA GSM Maupasant - Container Ship / 2019-06-22 - 2019-09-10 (3 months)
ETO: Seychelles Pioneer - Chemical tanker / 2020-02-06 - 2020-07-14 (5 months)
ETO: Seychelles Pioneer - Chemical tanker / 2019-05-28 - 2019-10-03 (4 months)
ETO: Seychelles Pioneer - Chemical tanker / 2018-09-17 - 2019-01-28 (4 months)
ETO: Vivaldi - Accommodation barge / 2022-06-01 - 2023-01-13 (7 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Sea Launch - Research vessel / 2021-06-01 - 2022-03-31 (10 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: FORTUNA - Pipe laying vessel / 2022-11-15 - 2023-02-21 (3 months)
ETO: YURY TOPCHEV - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-10-12 - 2022-10-27 (15 days)
ETO: Oceanic Champion - Seismic vessel / 2022-02-02 - 2022-04-01 (2 months)
ETO: Oceanic Champion - Seismic vessel / 2021-05-19 - 2021-08-28 (3 months)
ETO: Oceanic Champion - Seismic vessel / 2020-11-13 - 2021-02-26 (3 months)
El. Engineer: DCI-1 - Jack-up Platform / 2020-05-22 - 2021-05-21 (12 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: HILLA BUSHEH R - Crane vessel / 2018-06-20 - 2020-04-22 (1 year)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Svyatitel Innokentiy - Dry Cargo / 2020-04-24 - 2020-09-10 (5 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Svyatitel Innokentiy - General cargo / 2019-05-15 - 2019-12-04 (7 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Shturman Scherbinin - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-12-01 - 2020-09-05 (3 years)
El. Engineer: Valaris ds4 - Drilling platform / 2020-12-02 - 2021-03-05 (3 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Drefger - Dredger / 2017-09-17 - 2020-03-03 (2 years)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Drilling rigs - Drilling platform / 2014-08-16 - 2017-08-19 (3 years)
Chief Electrical Engineer: ODN1 - Drilling platform / 2011-07-20 - 2014-07-20 (3 years)
Chief Electrical Engineer: BANGKOK - Container Ship / 2022-09-05 - 2023-02-05 (5 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: LNG TESSALA - LPG / LNG / 2023-06-25 - 2024-01-10 (7 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Agios Fanourios I - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-08-16 - 2023-05-23 (9 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Viva Galaxy - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-23 - 2022-09-15 (7 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: V.F. Tanker-14 - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-03-15 - 2021-08-03 (5 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: V.F. Tanker-14 - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-05-30 - 2020-10-08 (4 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: V.F. Tanker-14 - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-09-15 - 2020-01-08 (4 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: V.F. Tanker-8 - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-03-07 - 2019-07-12 (4 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Gefest - Barge / 2019-11-27 - 2020-02-29 (3 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Борей - Dredger / 2019-07-21 - 2019-11-06 (4 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Bryansk - NAVY / 2008-08-02 - 2013-08-01 (4 years)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Bryansk - NAVY / 2003-08-12 - 2008-08-01 (4 years)