Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Alfa - General cargo / 2017-03-03 - 2017-10-20 (8 months)
AB Seaman: m/v Gold - Dry Cargo / 2014-04-10 - 2015-09-15 (1 year)
3rd Officer: Aleksandr Antonov - Dry Cargo / 2015-12-05 - 2016-11-30 (12 months)
AB Seaman: Sevastopol - RO-RO / 2016-06-01 - 2016-10-01 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Sevastopol - RO-RO / 2015-12-08 - 2016-06-01 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Sevastopol - RO-RO / 2014-12-26 - 2015-04-30 (4 months)
AB Seaman: navin ospray - Dry Cargo / 2015-07-16 - 2016-04-26 (9 months)
AB Seaman: M/V NAVIN OSPREY - Dry Cargo / 2015-07-16 - 2016-04-14 (9 months)
3rd Officer: Ocean Glory - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-23 - 2018-12-26 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Mercury - General cargo / 2017-09-14 - 2018-04-19 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Semera - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-20 - 2017-03-27 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Semera - Bulk Carrier / 2016-09-20 - 2016-12-19 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Western Boheme - Bulk Carrier / 2015-06-17 - 2016-02-17 (8 months)
OS: pasific - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-05-12 - 2015-10-05 (5 months)
OS: pygachev - Other vessels / 2014-09-24 - 2015-05-01 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Tsentavr - Tug boat / 2012-12-13 - 2014-02-05 (1 year)
AB Seaman: CAPTAIN MOKEEV - Reefer / 2009-09-29 - 2010-03-11 (5 months)
AB Seaman: PROLIV LONGA - Reefer / 2008-08-09 - 2009-03-19 (7 months)
AB Seaman: AKHTIAR - Tug boat / 2006-11-06 - 2008-01-19 (1 year)
AB Seaman: черноморец-3 - Crane vessel / 2006-03-02 - 2006-10-30 (8 months)
AB Seaman: MV HD BON Accord - DSV (Diving Support) / 2009-08-18 - 2012-09-01 (3 years)
AB Seaman: Bourbon Interprise - MRSV / 2012-03-20 - 2012-04-10 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Bourbon Liberty 244 - AHTS / 2011-09-21 - 2011-12-25 (3 months)
Junior officer: KONAK - General cargo / 2011-04-07 - 2011-08-14 (4 months)
OS: BBC Bulgaria - Multipurpose / 2008-03-10 - 2008-07-23 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Beta - Fishing vessel / 2008-05-06 - 2008-08-23 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Bizonas - Tug boat / 2007-10-23 - 2008-04-20 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Mt.prabhu parvati - Chemical tanker / 2024-01-25 - 2024-10-30 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Kord - Bunkering Vessel / 2024-03-18 - 2024-09-08 (6 months)
AB Seaman: N.Trubyatchinskiy - Other vessels / 2022-05-31 - 2023-11-10 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Mys Chikhacheva - Fishing vessel / 2015-08-01 - 2020-02-17 (4 years)
AB Seaman: MV IKARIA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-09-22 - 2024-07-17 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Lago di como - Bulk Carrier / 2024-02-06 - 2024-07-07 (5 months)
AB Seaman: D Angels - Container Ship / 2023-08-01 - 2024-06-21 (11 months)
AB Seaman: SEA-EYE 4 - Other vessels / 2022-11-15 - 2024-01-31 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Oosterschelde - Training Ship / 2022-05-14 - 2022-08-01 (3 months)
AB Seaman: De gallant - Sailing Vessel / 2019-07-03 - 2020-05-21 (11 months)
3rd Officer: Lidia V - General cargo / 2024-01-01 - 2024-03-29 (3 months)
AB Seaman: JAMES - Dredger / 2023-08-11 - 2023-12-22 (4 months)
AB Seaman: ASTRA - Dredger / 2022-12-21 - 2023-05-29 (5 months)
OS: Omskiy 7 - General cargo / 2022-06-23 - 2022-08-30 (2 months)
OS: Andrei Zuev - General cargo / 2021-09-25 - 2021-11-12 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: TONG DA - General cargo / 2023-02-04 - 2023-10-28 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Mubarak 20 - Landing Craft / 2023-09-20 - 2023-10-24 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Mubarak 20 - Landing Craft / 2021-09-23 - 2022-10-24 (1 year)