Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: Капитан Гурьев - Repair Vessel / 2019-07-31 - 2020-02-10 (6 months)
4th Engineer: VIET THUAN 235-01 - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-13 - 2019-10-04 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: M.V London courage - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-30 - 2018-06-03 (7 months)
Trainee Engineer: MV GOLDEN SKY 1 - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-31 - 2017-05-17 (10 months)
3rd Engineer: John Wulff - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-25 - 2018-07-10 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Suse - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-11 - 2017-11-07 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Copiapo - Container Ship / 2016-10-10 - 2017-02-10 (4 months)
4th Engineer: "Alexandr Suvorov" - Bulk Carrier / 2014-08-31 - 2015-01-25 (5 months)
4th Engineer: "Ivan Papanin" - RO-RO / 2014-05-12 - 2014-06-19 (1 month)
Ref. Engineer: "Vytegra" - General cargo / 2010-05-01 - 2013-05-01 (3 years)
Engine Cadet: AHTS Hamed Glory - AHTS / 2014-08-10 - 2014-12-28 (5 months)