Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Engineer: Chiyo Maru 3 - Fishing vessel / 2020-08-19 - 2021-04-15 (8 months)
Mechanic: Dukat - Fishing vessel / 2017-05-20 - 2019-12-11 (2 years)
4th Engineer: MV GH GALILEO - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-23 - 2021-04-14 (7 months)
Engineer Assistant: MV GH GALILEO - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-12 - 2020-09-22 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Ocean 19 - General cargo / 2017-11-04 - 2018-09-10 (10 months)
Motorman: SCF DON - Chemical tanker / 2020-07-24 - 2021-03-20 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Everbright - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-07-23 - 2022-12-23 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Melodia - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-08-18 - 2022-01-28 (5 months)
4th Engineer: STI Finchley - Chemical tanker / 2020-08-26 - 2021-02-15 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Adafera - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-04-11 - 2019-11-03 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Phoenix Hope - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-03-14 - 2018-08-30 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Seaspan Hamburg - Container Ship / 2020-08-26 - 2021-01-10 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Seaspan Ningbo - Container Ship / 2019-08-08 - 2020-01-30 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Seaspan Hamburg - Container Ship / 2018-07-22 - 2019-02-16 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: YM WELCOME - Container Ship / 2016-08-11 - 2017-03-20 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Seaspan Melbourne - Container Ship / 2015-09-27 - 2016-05-03 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Mv. Dharma lautan ruby - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-08 - 2020-08-26 (12 months)
Engine Cadet: MT Sepinggan - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-07-17 - 2019-01-27 (6 months)
AB / Motorman : NORTHERN MAGNUM - Container Ship / 2018-11-03 - 2019-05-11 (6 months)
AB / Motorman : NORTHERN MAJESTIC - Container Ship / 2017-11-10 - 2018-06-06 (7 months)
AB / Motorman : NORTHERN MAGNUM - Container Ship / 2015-08-10 - 2016-03-21 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Mv samanta - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-07 - 2018-11-03 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Mv venus - Container Ship / 2017-04-17 - 2017-06-08 (2 months)
Trainee Engineer: Mv Transfair - Bulk Carrier / 2013-09-15 - 2014-06-22 (9 months)
AB / Motorman: Lambro Kachioni - General cargo / 2018-05-24 - 2018-06-13 (1 month)
Motorman: Moryak - General cargo / 2017-05-19 - 2017-11-19 (6 months)
4th Engineer: K. Krems - Container Ship / 2017-05-29 - 2017-10-29 (5 months)
4th Engineer: K. Sergievskiy - Container Ship / 2016-10-27 - 2017-02-08 (3 months)
4th Engineer: K. Gnezdilov - Container Ship / 2015-11-24 - 2016-05-27 (6 months)
4th Engineer: MSC ISHYKA - Container Ship / 2017-04-13 - 2017-09-15 (5 months)
4th Engineer: MSC LUCIA - Container Ship / 2016-05-18 - 2016-11-03 (6 months)
Junior officer: MSC AUGUSTA - Container Ship / 2015-07-10 - 2016-01-22 (6 months)
Junior officer: MSC KOREA - Container Ship / 2014-07-29 - 2015-01-21 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MSC LEA - Container Ship / 2013-09-23 - 2014-03-08 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Altinia - RO-RO / 2018-12-22 - 2019-03-15 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Hamburg - Cruise Liner / 2018-04-25 - 2018-11-20 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Black Pearl - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-03 - 2018-03-25 (9 months)
4th Engineer: Lord Byron - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-03 - 2017-04-06 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: Henna Malta - Passenger vessel / 2015-10-16 - 2016-01-22 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Aeronavt - Fishing vessel / 2018-12-13 - 2019-05-13 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Vladivostok - Container Ship / 2018-07-10 - 2018-11-24 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Hyundai Bridge - Container Ship / 2017-05-09 - 2017-09-18 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Deva - Container Ship / 2016-08-27 - 2016-12-01 (3 months)
4th Engineer: Sudair - General cargo / 2016-01-05 - 2016-06-10 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: HHL Richards Bay - Heavy lift vessel / 2013-04-12 - 2013-09-03 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: HHL Richards Bay - Heavy lift vessel / 2012-04-18 - 2012-11-12 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Stadt Flensburg - Container Ship / 2010-11-27 - 2011-06-12 (7 months)
Motorman: Wilson Aviles - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2008-10-16 - 2009-05-10 (7 months)
4th Engineer: TRANSIT ZMEINKA - Container Ship / 2024-01-31 - 2024-06-02 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Panamax Alexander - Bulk Carrier / 2023-10-23 - 2023-12-20 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: Musa Oba - General cargo / 2023-07-21 - 2023-10-27 (3 months)
4th Engineer: Icoa Uru - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-05 - 2023-07-19 (1 month)
Motorman-welder: Pacific Trader - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-11-22 - 2023-08-08 (9 months)
Motorman-welder: Baltic Prosperity - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-11 - 2021-08-13 (4 months)
Motorman-welder: Hercules - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-13 - 2020-12-23 (5 months)
Motorman-welder: Iolaos - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-01 - 2020-03-06 (7 months)
Motorman-welder: Atlas - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-23 - 2019-03-19 (9 months)
4th Engineer: BEAR ALCOR - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-04-09 - 2023-08-02 (4 months)
Trainee Engineer: ADVANTAGE START - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-09-29 - 2022-03-05 (5 months)
4th Engineer: MED TEKIRDAG - Container Ship / 2021-07-07 - 2021-09-10 (2 months)
4th Engineer: Vivit Dubhe - LPG / LNG / 2022-09-15 - 2023-03-10 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Elandra Eagle - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-10-07 - 2022-06-09 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Elandra Eagle - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-03-20 - 2021-07-13 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Elandra Elbrus - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-07-07 - 2020-12-18 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Asphalt Splendor - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2019-09-10 - 2020-01-10 (4 months)