Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Officer: MT LADY VIK - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-03-08 - 2021-07-10 (4 months)
3rd Officer: MT-UNDINE - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-18 - 2020-11-18 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Wislaborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-02-16 - 2021-06-27 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Amurborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-06-10 - 2020-10-04 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Amurborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-09-07 - 2020-01-08 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Vechtborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-08-01 - 2018-12-16 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Mt oluwaseun - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-29 - 2020-12-01 (10 months)
3rd Officer: Gaz Serenity - LPG / LNG / 2020-05-20 - 2020-09-21 (4 months)
Junior officer: Gaz Imperial - LPG / LNG / 2019-08-27 - 2020-01-18 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Seagas Governor - LPG / LNG / 2018-04-23 - 2019-01-08 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: TSV "Druzhba" - Sailing Vessel / 2020-07-20 - 2020-08-16 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Nordic London - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-07 - 2019-11-04 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Nordic Beijing - Container Ship / 2018-06-26 - 2018-10-19 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Nordic Stockholm - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-15 - 2018-04-18 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Sapura Topazio - Pipe laying vessel / 2018-06-30 - 2019-10-03 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Vicente Pinzon - Container Ship / 2017-08-01 - 2017-10-01 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Mangystau-3 - Tug boat / 2021-12-24 - 2023-05-12 (1 year)
2nd Officer: Mangystau-3 - Tug boat / 2019-03-16 - 2021-12-23 (2 years)
3rd Officer: Mangystau-3 - Tug boat / 2017-01-15 - 2019-03-15 (2 years)
AB Seaman: mv GULF PEARL - Well-stimulation vessel / 2018-02-01 - 2018-08-26 (7 months)
AB Seaman: mv Mecta S - General cargo / 2014-08-30 - 2015-03-31 (7 months)
OS: ANDEAVOUR - Bulk Carrier / 2012-10-06 - 2013-04-07 (6 months)
OS: ARKTOS - Bulk Carrier / 2011-06-17 - 2012-04-07 (10 months)
3rd Officer: Marathi - Crude Oil Tanker / 2024-03-28 - 2024-08-31 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Patmos i - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-12-28 - 2023-09-25 (9 months)
3rd Officer: INTAN DAYA 272 - General cargo / 2023-08-17 - 2024-06-25 (10 months)
2nd Officer: The Sheriff - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-01-17 - 2024-04-17 (3 months)
3rd Officer: The Sheriff - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-10-26 - 2024-01-16 (3 months)
Trainee Officer: Sigrid Theresa - Chemical tanker / 2023-06-24 - 2023-08-26 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: LNG Kano - LPG / LNG / 2022-08-27 - 2022-12-06 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: BW Everett - LPG / LNG / 2021-05-07 - 2021-10-14 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Karina Theresa - Chemical tanker / 2020-07-26 - 2020-09-02 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Navig8 Gauntlet - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-02-25 - 2023-07-25 (5 months)
3rd Officer: MT Marie S - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-02-25 - 2022-08-26 (6 months)
3rd Officer: front future - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-10-14 - 2023-07-03 (9 months)
3rd Officer: ASTROL-5 - General cargo / 2023-01-10 - 2023-05-16 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Astrol-7 - General cargo / 2021-09-01 - 2022-01-06 (4 months)
OS: York - General cargo / 2020-04-15 - 2020-09-08 (5 months)
OS: York - General cargo / 2019-04-23 - 2019-09-09 (5 months)
OS: Dvina - General cargo / 2018-03-29 - 2018-09-01 (5 months)
2nd Officer: DELTA - General cargo / 2022-10-15 - 2023-04-20 (6 months)
OS: Scf Baltica - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-05-06 - 2023-10-05 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Volgotrans-2702 - Chemical tanker / 2022-10-10 - 2023-03-01 (5 months)
OS: Petrotrans-5903 - General cargo / 2021-05-21 - 2021-11-01 (5 months)
OS: Bavly - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-01 - 2020-09-23 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Bavly - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-05-29 - 2019-08-31 (3 months)