Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Officer: Professor Logachev - Research vessel / 2023-02-10 - 2024-02-07 (12 months)
AB Seaman: New sky - Reefer / 2022-11-26 - 2023-08-08 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: Defender - General cargo / 2022-03-26 - 2022-11-01 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Volaris 53 - General cargo / 2021-08-14 - 2022-02-20 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Germes - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-11-22 - 2023-02-20 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Yuzhmorgeologiya - Research vessel / 2022-09-01 - 2022-11-16 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Yuzhmorgeologiya - Research vessel / 2022-05-16 - 2022-08-31 (3 months)
OS: Anatoly Kolodkin - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-02-21 - 2021-09-13 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Knyaz Vladimir - Cruise Liner / 2019-08-19 - 2020-01-13 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Wec Van Eyck - Container Ship / 2022-07-01 - 2023-01-12 (6 months)
3rd Officer: WEC VAN EYCK - Container Ship / 2021-04-28 - 2021-11-09 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: MSC ISHYKA - Container Ship / 2019-04-21 - 2019-10-13 (6 months)
Junior officer: MT Central - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-08-16 - 2022-10-21 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: MT Diamond Express - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-07 - 2020-08-31 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: MT Island Express - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-07 - 2020-08-06 (7 months)
3rd Officer: MV Yuan Jian Hai - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-20 - 2019-10-19 (9 months)
3rd Officer: Victorius - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-21 - 2022-07-24 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Cressida - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-25 - 2021-11-09 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Gant Muse - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-10 - 2021-02-23 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Captain George K - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-03 - 2020-01-04 (8 months)
3rd Officer: Eco leader - VLCC / 2021-11-15 - 2022-06-10 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Eco leader - VLCC / 2020-11-05 - 2021-04-20 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: STS MIR - Yacht / 2018-09-12 - 2018-11-15 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: STS MIR - Yacht / 2016-04-15 - 2016-10-09 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Olympus - VLCC / 2023-03-22 - 2023-10-09 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Platanos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-05-18 - 2022-11-09 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Aristarchos - Chemical tanker / 2021-08-19 - 2022-01-27 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Platanos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-01-15 - 2021-05-10 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Platanos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-03-01 - 2020-07-21 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Maxim - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-06-06 - 2022-01-11 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Front polaris - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-08-13 - 2020-07-02 (11 months)
3rd Officer: Sonagol Cazenga - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-08-29 - 2019-03-21 (7 months)
3rd Officer: New vigorous - VLCC / 2018-04-12 - 2018-06-14 (2 months)
3rd Officer: New joviality - VLCC / 2017-08-18 - 2017-12-23 (4 months)
OS: Libramont - LPG / LNG / 2021-07-18 - 2021-11-17 (4 months)
OS: Sombeke - LPG / LNG / 2020-07-18 - 2021-02-02 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Portovyy - LPG / LNG / 2019-12-11 - 2020-05-24 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Sea Amazon H - RO-RO / 2021-05-19 - 2021-11-10 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Sea Amazon H - RO-RO / 2021-02-02 - 2021-05-18 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Sea Hellinis - RO-RO / 2020-01-27 - 2020-08-24 (7 months)
OS: MSC ADRIANA - Container Ship / 2017-10-05 - 2017-12-28 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Consul - General cargo / 2016-08-04 - 2017-02-15 (6 months)
AB Seaman: KEMA - Dry Cargo / 2021-07-28 - 2021-10-17 (3 months)
3rd Officer: M.T Greenbelt - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-11-13 - 2021-05-15 (6 months)
3rd Officer: M.T Acebitumen 1 - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2019-08-22 - 2019-12-27 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: M T ELSA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-05-26 - 2020-06-08 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Volgoneft 121 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-07-16 - 2021-11-25 (4 months)
3rd Officer: F.I Panferov - Passenger vessel / 2019-04-10 - 2019-10-18 (6 months)
OS: Lev Tolstoy - Cruise Liner / 2018-06-17 - 2018-10-07 (4 months)
Stewardess: Vladimir Mayakovsky - Passenger vessel / 2017-04-12 - 2017-10-23 (6 months)
2nd Officer: AXEL SPIRIT - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-08-17 - 2021-03-31 (7 months)
2nd Officer: TARBET SPIRIT - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-10-19 - 2019-12-12 (2 months)
3rd Officer: TARBET SPIRIT - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-04-11 - 2019-10-18 (6 months)
3rd Officer: TARBET SPIRIT - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-07-24 - 2018-12-18 (5 months)
3rd Officer: AUSTRALIAN SPIRIT - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-12-12 - 2018-04-20 (4 months)
2nd Officer: CMA CGM THAMES - Container Ship / 2020-02-06 - 2020-07-30 (6 months)
3rd Officer: CMA CGM Thames - Container Ship / 2019-05-28 - 2019-10-03 (4 months)
3rd Officer: CMA CGM Thames - Container Ship / 2018-09-05 - 2019-01-13 (4 months)
3rd Officer: CMA CGM Thames - Container Ship / 2018-01-21 - 2018-05-17 (4 months)
3rd Officer: CMA CGM RIGOLETTO - Container Ship / 2017-05-05 - 2017-10-06 (5 months)
3rd Officer: MV Promise 1 - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-12 - 2019-08-21 (5 months)
3rd Officer: MV TR PRINCE - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-10 - 2018-11-26 (3 months)
3rd Officer: M.V. LAKE DYNASTY - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-11 - 2018-01-27 (6 months)
3rd Officer: MV Triton Swallow - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-01 - 2017-03-05 (10 months)
Deck Cadet: Gayatri Devi - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-04-03 - 2019-08-02 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Gayatri Devi - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-08-01 - 2018-08-02 (1 year)
3rd Officer: GENER8 STRENGTH - VLCC / 2018-08-10 - 2019-02-28 (7 months)
3rd Officer: GENER8 MILTIADES - VLCC / 2017-04-15 - 2017-10-31 (7 months)