Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Officer: Golden Oak - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-09-21 - 2023-01-31 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Askholmen - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-11-23 - 2022-05-23 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Askholmen - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-02-12 - 2021-07-04 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Askholmen - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-16 - 2020-12-05 (5 months)
Pumpman: Larsholmen - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-05-25 - 2019-10-30 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: lorax - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-07-02 - 2023-01-07 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: SUNSHINE - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-14 - 2021-12-18 (5 months)
3rd Officer: BBC RAISE - General cargo / 2022-07-07 - 2022-11-24 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Volgonef-125 - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-06-20 - 2022-11-07 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Volgonef-134 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-04-25 - 2021-10-23 (6 months)
3rd Officer: atlantic discovery - Cable laying vessel / 2022-06-14 - 2022-10-31 (5 months)
3rd Officer: SEASPAN LUMACO - Container Ship / 2022-01-22 - 2022-10-25 (9 months)
Junior officer: MAERSK GENOA - Container Ship / 2021-03-04 - 2021-09-19 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: COSCO HARMONY - Container Ship / 2019-12-03 - 2020-06-05 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: MOL BRAVO - Container Ship / 2018-11-28 - 2019-06-04 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: MOL EMISSARY - Container Ship / 2018-01-16 - 2018-07-01 (5 months)
3rd Officer: HELENA G - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-20 - 2022-09-30 (7 months)
3rd Officer: MARIA G - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-13 - 2021-10-23 (3 months)
Boatswain: MARIA G - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-26 - 2021-07-12 (7 months)
AB / Crane Operator: ISABELLE G - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-09 - 2020-09-25 (11 months)
AB Seaman: Maria G - General cargo / 2018-11-10 - 2019-08-31 (10 months)
Deck Cadet: SAN GUILLERMO - Ferry / 2021-12-01 - 2022-09-24 (10 months)
AB Seaman: Johanna G - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-07 - 2022-09-24 (11 months)
AB Seaman: Hansa Limburg - Container Ship / 2020-11-14 - 2021-05-07 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Blue Wing - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-18 - 2020-01-11 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Blue Wing - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-16 - 2019-09-17 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Pallada - General cargo / 2018-09-05 - 2019-01-24 (5 months)
3rd Officer: San felix - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-08-15 - 2021-11-20 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Mare di genova - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-11-11 - 2017-03-04 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Mare di genova - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-10-04 - 2016-04-16 (6 months)
3rd Officer: San Gwann - High Speed Craft / 2021-09-30 - 2021-11-19 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Swarna Krishna - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-02-26 - 2021-05-02 (2 months)
OS: MATE - Container Ship / 2020-07-25 - 2021-02-04 (6 months)
AB Seaman: MBC ROSE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-07 - 2020-04-11 (8 months)
OS: MSC MARS - Container Ship / 2018-06-02 - 2019-02-19 (9 months)
OS: MSC EARTH - Container Ship / 2017-03-27 - 2018-02-04 (10 months)
AB Seaman: ALBANY - General cargo / 2015-11-09 - 2016-05-04 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Veniamin Khlopin - Container Ship / 2020-12-27 - 2021-05-21 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Veniamin Khlopin - Container Ship / 2020-12-05 - 2020-12-26 (1 month)
Navigation Officer: Naval Ship - NAVY / 2013-07-27 - 2018-07-26 (4 years)
Navigation Officer: Naval Ship - NAVY / 2008-07-28 - 2013-07-26 (4 years)
2nd Officer: Iolcos Legacy - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-31 - 2021-09-27 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Iolcos Ambition - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-30 - 2020-09-05 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Iolcos Fighter - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-08 - 2019-09-17 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Yannis Gorgias - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-10 - 2019-02-23 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Andreas Petrakis - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-23 - 2017-12-15 (9 months)
3rd Officer: AM Zenica - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-10 - 2020-08-08 (9 months)
3rd Officer: Sohar Max - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-18 - 2018-08-22 (6 months)
OS: Knyaz Vladimir - Passenger vessel / 2020-02-29 - 2020-04-13 (1 month)
OS: SCF Provider - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-07-08 - 2020-01-19 (6 months)
OS: Knyaz Vladimir - Passenger vessel / 2019-01-01 - 2019-05-08 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Viking Conquest - RO-RO / 2019-09-13 - 2020-02-18 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Viking Diamond - RO-RO / 2019-02-09 - 2019-06-05 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Viking Ocean - RO-RO / 2018-03-20 - 2018-09-10 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Viking Ocean - RO-RO / 2017-06-06 - 2017-10-22 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Sun Unicorn - Container Ship / 2022-05-06 - 2022-09-06 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Sun Unicorn - Container Ship / 2021-08-27 - 2021-12-22 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Phobus - Dry Cargo / 2020-11-05 - 2021-01-15 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Antares - Dry Cargo / 2019-10-25 - 2020-01-05 (2 months)
3rd Officer: General Hazi Aslanov - Chemical tanker / 2018-07-25 - 2018-09-25 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Agia TRIAS - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-28 - 2019-04-29 (1 year)