Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Officer: Anichkov Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-04-08 - 2018-08-28 (5 months)
3rd Officer: m/t "Anichkov Bridge" - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-01-25 - 2017-05-23 (4 months)
3rd Officer: m/t "Timofey Guzhenko" - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-08-15 - 2016-10-26 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Okhta Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-09-19 - 2016-02-14 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Okhta Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-11-02 - 2015-04-07 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Emmanuel C - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-02 - 2018-04-25 (7 months)
3rd Officer: GLORY - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-07 - 2017-02-11 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Lucky Luke - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-25 - 2016-04-05 (6 months)
AB Seaman: TransOsprey - General cargo / 2014-09-06 - 2015-03-27 (7 months)
3rd Officer: M/V GERDA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-12 - 2017-12-30 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Gerda - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-12 - 2017-12-30 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: M T AL DOAB 5 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-11-09 - 2017-06-28 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: THEOSKEPASTI - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-24 - 2016-05-04 (1 year)
3rd Officer: Glovis Maria - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-01 - 2017-01-18 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Cerinthus - Container Ship / 2015-08-25 - 2016-03-06 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Cerinthus - Container Ship / 2014-10-07 - 2015-05-06 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Orient Target - Bulk Carrier / 2014-02-19 - 2014-06-10 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Orient Dispatch - Bulk Carrier / 2013-06-23 - 2013-10-24 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Kazdanga - Chemical tanker / 2015-06-07 - 2015-08-06 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Kraslava - Chemical tanker / 2014-12-17 - 2015-04-20 (4 months)
Junior officer: Krisjanis Valdemars - Chemical tanker / 2014-04-20 - 2014-08-19 (4 months)
OS: Kanpur - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-05-08 - 2013-11-11 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Belorus - Dry Cargo / 2012-07-11 - 2012-11-14 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Professor Hlyustin - Dry Cargo / 2014-09-03 - 2014-11-26 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Professor Hlyustin - Dry Cargo / 2013-09-13 - 2014-01-16 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Zolotaya Kolyma - Bulk Carrier / 2012-08-21 - 2013-03-12 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Ocean Leader - Bulk Carrier / 2012-01-04 - 2012-02-23 (2 months)
Chief Officer: LEDA DV - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-12-12 - 2015-01-20 (1 month)
2nd Officer: BUKHTA SLAVYANKA - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-11-17 - 2014-12-11 (1 month)
3rd Officer: ZOLOTOJ MOST - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-05-28 - 2014-10-21 (5 months)
2nd Officer: PAVINO - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-02-01 - 2014-04-07 (2 months)
2nd Officer: ARCTIC BREEZE - Chemical tanker / 2013-04-19 - 2013-09-06 (5 months)
2nd Officer: MSC JOY - Container Ship / 2016-01-31 - 2016-07-21 (6 months)
2nd Officer: AS MORGANA - Container Ship / 2015-04-27 - 2015-09-17 (5 months)
3rd Officer: AS Savonia - Container Ship / 2014-04-25 - 2014-10-14 (6 months)
3rd Officer: AS Saxonia - Container Ship / 2013-05-26 - 2013-11-07 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Niledutch Guangzhou - Container Ship / 2012-06-21 - 2012-12-09 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Wilson Fedje - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-06-07 - 2013-10-23 (5 months)
3rd Officer: African Jaguar - Bulk Carrier / 2011-11-23 - 2012-05-30 (6 months)
3rd Officer: African Jaguar - Bulk Carrier / 2010-12-16 - 2011-06-07 (6 months)
3rd Officer: African Jaguar - Bulk Carrier / 2008-12-28 - 2009-05-21 (5 months)
AB Seaman: African Python - Bulk Carrier / 2007-05-06 - 2007-12-05 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Omega Prince - Chemical tanker / 2012-11-23 - 2013-04-03 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Omega Prince - Chemical tanker / 2012-11-23 - 2013-04-03 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Omega Prince - Chemical tanker / 2012-11-23 - 2013-04-03 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Omega Prince - Chemical tanker / 2012-11-23 - 2013-04-03 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Omega Prince - Chemical tanker / 2012-11-23 - 2013-04-03 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Trefin Leader - Chemical tanker / 2013-11-01 - 2014-03-22 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Straitview - Chemical tanker / 2013-06-10 - 2013-09-09 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Straitview - Chemical tanker / 2013-04-08 - 2013-06-10 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Straitview - Chemical tanker / 2012-07-22 - 2012-12-11 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Straitview - Chemical tanker / 2012-01-04 - 2012-05-11 (4 months)
2nd Officer: AGATA M - Heavy lift vessel / 2011-11-12 - 2012-09-01 (10 months)
3rd Officer: EMSMOON - Bulk Carrier / 2010-06-23 - 2010-12-23 (6 months)
3rd Officer: CAPE HENRY - Container Ship / 2010-03-20 - 2010-05-20 (2 months)
3rd Officer: EMSMOON - Bulk Carrier / 2009-04-07 - 2009-09-20 (5 months)
2nd Officer: CAPE PIONEER - Bulk Carrier / 2009-10-10 - 2010-05-13 (7 months)
2nd Officer: CAPE PIONEER - Bulk Carrier / 2008-11-11 - 2009-04-11 (5 months)
2nd Officer: CAPE PIONEER - Bulk Carrier / 2007-11-16 - 2008-05-24 (6 months)
2nd Officer: CAPE KASSOS - Bulk Carrier / 2007-01-12 - 2007-09-21 (8 months)
3rd Officer: CAPE KASSOS - Bulk Carrier / 2006-04-18 - 2006-11-21 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Polar Endeavour - Crude Oil Tanker / 2024-05-10 - 2024-08-09 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Kennedy - Training Ship / 2023-06-01 - 2023-08-06 (2 months)
3rd Officer: xxx - Container Ship / 2023-11-20 - 2024-05-09 (6 months)
3rd Officer: xxx - Container Ship / 2022-12-15 - 2023-06-28 (6 months)
3rd Officer: xxx - Container Ship / 2021-05-28 - 2021-11-25 (6 months)
3rd Officer: xxx - Container Ship / 2020-10-26 - 2021-03-04 (4 months)
3rd Officer: MT silvia - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-11-02 - 2024-05-05 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Mt sinopa - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-07-20 - 2023-10-10 (3 months)
3rd Officer: MT derya - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-04-06 - 2023-07-19 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Alberta - Bulk Carrier / 2023-11-15 - 2024-04-29 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Amapola - Bulk Carrier / 2022-09-03 - 2023-05-05 (8 months)
AB Seaman: CMA CGM CENDRILLON - Container Ship / 2021-08-23 - 2022-04-07 (7 months)
AB / Crane Operator: CMA CGM HERODOTE - Container Ship / 2020-09-20 - 2021-05-19 (8 months)
3rd Officer: Alliance - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-15 - 2024-03-15 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: MAERSK VENEZIA - Container Ship / 2024-09-04 - 2024-03-10 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: FEDERAL SKEENA - Bulk Carrier / 2023-01-09 - 2023-07-18 (6 months)