Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
2nd Officer: Gotland Sofia - Chemical tanker / 2019-11-10 - 2019-12-15 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Gotland Sofia - Chemical tanker / 2019-08-13 - 2019-11-09 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Anuket Opal - Chemical tanker / 2018-04-14 - 2018-09-25 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Vestholmen - Chemical tanker / 2017-05-02 - 2017-07-27 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Vestholmen - Chemical tanker / 2016-10-07 - 2017-01-26 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Arvika - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-08 - 2022-07-22 (8 months)
2nd Officer: AVIONA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-18 - 2021-05-29 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Usolie - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-10 - 2019-11-06 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Arvika - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-03 - 2019-01-02 (10 months)
3rd Officer: Iron Kovdor - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-22 - 2018-01-11 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: WL TOTMA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-02 - 2019-10-18 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2018-04-15 - 2018-11-15 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2017-07-05 - 2017-09-30 (3 months)
2nd Officer: MSC Giannina - Container Ship / 2021-04-09 - 2022-01-05 (9 months)
2nd Officer: MSC Barbara - Container Ship / 2020-05-27 - 2020-12-14 (7 months)
2nd Officer: MSC BRIANNA - Container Ship / 2019-09-08 - 2020-02-24 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Northern Jaguar - Container Ship / 2019-02-14 - 2019-06-30 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Safmarine Bayete - Container Ship / 2018-07-20 - 2018-11-20 (4 months)
3rd Officer: M.V Goulphar - Other vessels / 2019-02-20 - 2019-05-03 (2 months)
3rd Officer: M.V Gustave Perreau - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-11-06 - 2019-02-02 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: LOUISA SCHULTE - Container Ship / 2017-04-13 - 2018-01-25 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: MOL GLOBE - Container Ship / 2016-12-08 - 2017-03-04 (3 months)
3rd Officer: MSC LUCY - Container Ship / 2018-05-27 - 2019-02-20 (9 months)
2nd Officer: MSC MARTA - Container Ship / 2016-12-13 - 2017-05-14 (5 months)
2nd Officer: MSC ASYA - Container Ship / 2016-08-10 - 2016-10-21 (2 months)
2nd Officer: MSC MARTA - Container Ship / 2015-02-21 - 2015-11-10 (9 months)
2nd Officer: MSC ROSSELLA - Container Ship / 2014-06-19 - 2014-11-09 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Fleet Star - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-01-15 - 2019-02-09 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Ocean Energy - Heavy lift vessel / 2018-10-03 - 2019-01-15 (3 months)
OS: Steffi C - General cargo / 2016-09-07 - 2017-04-28 (8 months)
3rd Officer: Bukhta Asacha - Reefer / 2018-09-16 - 2019-02-07 (5 months)
3rd Officer: YASON - Bunkering Vessel / 2017-12-10 - 2018-04-10 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Ikaluk - AHTS / 2016-06-07 - 2016-09-10 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Langery - AHTS / 2015-10-30 - 2016-01-24 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Ikaluk - AHTS / 2015-05-26 - 2015-08-26 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Nikiforos - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-12 - 2019-03-17 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Nikiforos - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-23 - 2018-11-12 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Nikiforos - Bulk Carrier / 2015-05-29 - 2015-12-01 (6 months)
2nd Officer: PEgasus - Bulk Carrier / 2012-12-26 - 2014-04-29 (1 year)
2nd Officer: VOLGO 4007 - General cargo / 2018-04-16 - 2018-10-17 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Uta - General cargo / 2016-03-02 - 2016-09-16 (6 months)
OS: Altenavi - General cargo / 2014-08-27 - 2015-04-04 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Staropolye - General cargo / 2012-08-10 - 2013-02-08 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Wec Mondriaan - Container Ship / 2019-11-10 - 2020-06-12 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Italian Express - Container Ship / 2018-11-30 - 2019-03-22 (4 months)
3rd Officer: X-Press Etna - Container Ship / 2018-04-12 - 2018-09-04 (5 months)
3rd Officer: X-Press Etna - Container Ship / 2017-08-08 - 2017-12-08 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Max Kudo - Container Ship / 2016-07-21 - 2017-01-08 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Zealand Juliana - General cargo / 2018-02-20 - 2018-07-02 (4 months)
OS: Juliana - General cargo / 2017-04-29 - 2017-10-14 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Isandora - Dry Cargo / 2014-04-21 - 2015-02-24 (10 months)
Deck Cadet: SLV - 359 - Other vessels / 2013-05-15 - 2013-08-31 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Rome Trader - Dry Cargo / 2017-12-08 - 2018-05-01 (5 months)
3rd Officer: BBC Citrine - Heavy lift vessel / 2016-03-06 - 2016-09-14 (6 months)
OS: Sina - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-11-04 - 2015-05-09 (6 months)
OS: Wolthusen - Dry Cargo / 2013-10-17 - 2014-04-19 (6 months)
OS: Wolthusen - Dry Cargo / 2012-10-08 - 2013-04-09 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Shagang Hongchang - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-18 - 2018-03-23 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Kota Cempaka - Container Ship / 2016-11-06 - 2017-04-26 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Tong An Cheng - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-11-26 - 2016-08-04 (8 months)
3rd Officer: HAM 310 - Dredger / 2017-03-15 - 2017-04-26 (1 month)
3rd Officer: HAM 310 - Dredger / 2016-12-07 - 2017-01-18 (1 month)
3rd Officer: HAM 310 - Dredger / 2016-09-14 - 2016-10-26 (1 month)
3rd Officer: HAM 310 - Dredger / 2016-06-20 - 2016-08-01 (1 month)
AB Seaman: DORIS - AHT / 2016-04-04 - 2016-05-19 (1 month)
2nd Officer: Istra - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-09-09 - 2018-01-04 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Alexander Nevskiy - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-08-05 - 2016-11-30 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Istra - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-10-03 - 2015-12-29 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Silver Ice - Reefer / 2014-09-05 - 2014-12-13 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Dalian-1 - General cargo / 2012-09-09 - 2013-02-28 (6 months)
2nd Officer: MCP GRAZ - General cargo / 2021-12-07 - 2022-06-29 (7 months)
2nd Officer: MCP SALZBURG - General cargo / 2020-12-14 - 2021-07-16 (7 months)
2nd Officer: IAPETOS - Container Ship / 2017-12-12 - 2018-05-25 (5 months)
2nd Officer: MAPOCHO - Container Ship / 2017-04-06 - 2017-09-28 (6 months)
3rd Officer: DS REPUBLIC - Container Ship / 2016-02-15 - 2016-06-08 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Favorite - General cargo / 2016-11-05 - 2017-06-12 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Mandona - Bulk Carrier / 2015-11-03 - 2016-03-10 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Sea Kestrel - General cargo / 2015-04-22 - 2015-09-14 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Maritime Power - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-03 - 2017-02-08 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Kambanos - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-09 - 2015-11-27 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Kambanos - Bulk Carrier / 2015-03-12 - 2015-09-08 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Yeoman Bridge - Bulk Carrier / 2014-02-12 - 2014-06-19 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Euro Carrier - Bulk Carrier / 2013-09-08 - 2013-10-31 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Leonid Zayakin - General cargo / 2016-12-24 - 2017-08-10 (8 months)
2nd Officer: VM FORAR - Dry Cargo / 2015-07-03 - 2016-01-21 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Vasiliy Tatishev - Dry Cargo / 2014-04-08 - 2014-10-18 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Borealis - General cargo / 2013-04-17 - 2013-11-12 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Konak - General cargo / 2012-07-20 - 2012-10-13 (3 months)