Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
2nd Officer: Buxtehude - Container Ship / 2018-01-25 - 2018-06-25 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Buxtehude - Container Ship / 2017-04-08 - 2017-09-05 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Buxtehude - Container Ship / 2016-06-28 - 2016-12-02 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Buxtehude - Container Ship / 2015-11-06 - 2016-03-14 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Marconnecticut - Container Ship / 2015-01-17 - 2015-06-08 (5 months)
2nd Officer: AVANG - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-10 - 2019-08-14 (6 months)
2nd Officer: MEHMET AGA - General cargo / 2018-06-26 - 2018-12-27 (6 months)
3rd Officer: MEHMET AGA - General cargo / 2018-05-08 - 2018-06-25 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Tevfik Bey - General cargo / 2017-10-13 - 2017-12-07 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Tevfik Bey - General cargo / 2017-03-31 - 2017-10-12 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Leon Apollon - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-11-26 - 2020-08-04 (8 months)
2nd Officer: Leon Hermes - Chemical tanker / 2019-01-24 - 2019-08-20 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Leon Hermes - Chemical tanker / 2018-06-18 - 2018-09-19 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Leon Hermes - Chemical tanker / 2018-02-24 - 2018-06-18 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Clipper Lasco - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-03 - 2017-10-01 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Cosco Hope - Container Ship / 2023-04-16 - 2023-10-21 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Seaspan Adonis - Container Ship / 2021-07-23 - 2022-02-04 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Seaspan Loncomilla - Container Ship / 2020-02-29 - 2020-12-01 (9 months)
2nd Officer: YM Witness - Container Ship / 2018-12-09 - 2019-07-08 (7 months)
3rd Officer: MOL Bellwether - Container Ship / 2017-11-21 - 2018-06-17 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Mystras - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-13 - 2018-06-16 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Aetolia - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-07 - 2017-02-28 (7 months)
OS: Wugang Asia - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-14 - 2016-03-20 (6 months)
OS: Bridgegate - Bulk Carrier / 2014-11-18 - 2015-04-25 (5 months)
OS: Pilion - Bulk Carrier / 2013-07-07 - 2014-01-16 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Mehmet Bey - General cargo / 2019-10-27 - 2020-05-27 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Celik-1 - General cargo / 2019-03-03 - 2019-06-27 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Celik-1 - General cargo / 2017-11-30 - 2018-06-14 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Sormovskiy 119 - General cargo / 2017-03-01 - 2017-07-28 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Sormovskiy 119 - General cargo / 2016-02-02 - 2016-10-19 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Sea Spider - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-04-04 - 2018-06-13 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Sea Spider - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-11-14 - 2018-01-24 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Sea Spider - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-07-28 - 2017-09-08 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Sea Spear - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-03-13 - 2017-07-06 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Sea Spear - Platform Supply vessel / 2016-07-12 - 2016-11-13 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Samskip Crystal - Reefer / 2018-06-01 - 2018-06-09 (8 days)
Junior officer: Samskip Crystal - Reefer / 2018-02-22 - 2018-05-31 (3 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Green Explorer - Reefer / 2017-06-13 - 2017-10-21 (4 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Green Explorer - Reefer / 2016-09-21 - 2017-02-03 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Green Explorer - Reefer / 2015-11-23 - 2016-05-17 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Sea Gloria - LPG / LNG / 2020-01-17 - 2020-09-05 (8 months)
2nd Officer: Nisyros - LPG / LNG / 2018-10-26 - 2019-03-19 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Immanuel Schulte - LPG / LNG / 2018-01-27 - 2018-06-06 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Irmgard Schulte - LPG / LNG / 2017-06-17 - 2017-10-13 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Coral Rubrum - LPG / LNG / 2017-03-10 - 2017-05-29 (3 months)
2nd Officer: IOLCOS UNITY - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-26 - 2021-03-17 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Nodus - General cargo / 2019-12-09 - 2020-06-21 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Almirante Storni - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-07 - 2019-06-11 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Almirante Storni - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-25 - 2018-06-04 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Orion Bay - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-15 - 2017-03-07 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Ensenada - Container Ship / 2021-03-07 - 2021-10-23 (8 months)
2nd Officer: Queen Esther - Container Ship / 2019-09-24 - 2020-07-13 (10 months)
2nd Officer: Texas Trader - Container Ship / 2018-12-21 - 2019-06-25 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Texas Trader - Container Ship / 2018-06-02 - 2018-07-20 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Texas Trader - Container Ship / 2018-01-15 - 2018-06-02 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Rix Warrior - General cargo / 2023-04-10 - 2023-08-01 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Rix crystal - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2022-07-10 - 2022-12-12 (5 months)
AB Seaman: SoPhie Schulte - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-06-10 - 2021-06-13 (1 year)
2nd Officer: Hawar - Tug boat / 2017-05-11 - 2019-09-11 (2 years)
3rd Officer: Goeast - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-03-01 - 2018-06-01 (3 months)
Junior officer: Clipper Target - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-22 - 2018-06-01 (6 months)
Junior officer: Clipper Trader - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-05 - 2017-07-03 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Glykofilousa 3 - RO-RO / 2016-09-19 - 2016-09-25 (6 days)
AB / Welder: Djibloho - Reefer / 2015-04-08 - 2015-10-20 (6 months)
AB / Welder: Glykofilousa 3 - RO-RO / 2014-09-28 - 2015-03-20 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Proteus - Bulk Carrier / 2023-07-01 - 2023-11-26 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Amoenitas - Heavy lift vessel / 2022-07-01 - 2023-01-12 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Klara - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-09-15 - 2022-03-27 (6 months)
AB Seaman: BBC Austria - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-12-20 - 2021-06-22 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Dock III - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-12-28 - 2018-05-28 (5 months)
3rd Officer: BOSPHORUS PRINCE - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-21 - 2018-05-26 (6 months)
2nd Officer: adves - General cargo / 2017-03-15 - 2017-09-14 (6 months)
Boatswain: immensity - General cargo / 2016-11-28 - 2017-02-21 (3 months)
AB Seaman: salacak - General cargo / 2016-05-12 - 2016-09-21 (4 months)
Boatswain: mv forar - Dry Cargo / 2015-11-12 - 2016-04-17 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Wigan - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-20 - 2018-05-24 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Kambanos - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-04 - 2017-11-17 (6 months)
Junior officer: Corcovado - Container Ship / 2016-03-23 - 2016-09-06 (5 months)
Junior officer: Aquila - Bulk Carrier / 2015-08-29 - 2015-12-13 (3 months)
OS: Gulf Lion - General cargo / 2013-09-08 - 2014-03-20 (6 months)
3rd Officer: VITIM - Container Ship / 2017-11-26 - 2018-05-22 (6 months)
3rd Officer: VITIM - Container Ship / 2016-10-24 - 2017-05-16 (7 months)
3rd Officer: VITIM - Container Ship / 2015-08-01 - 2016-03-27 (8 months)
3rd Officer: VITIM - Container Ship / 2014-07-14 - 2015-01-08 (6 months)
3rd Officer: ABRIS - Bulk Carrier / 2014-03-09 - 2014-06-20 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Bas Puma - AHT / 2024-06-10 - 2024-09-06 (3 months)
Chief Officer: FElIX - Tug boat / 2023-06-11 - 2023-11-23 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Star Hercules - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-13 - 2020-09-03 (12 months)
2nd Officer: Star Aquila - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-14 - 2019-04-04 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Star Aquila - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-03 - 2018-05-19 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Key Bay - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-02-03 - 2018-05-17 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Key Bora - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-03-25 - 2017-11-06 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Ngol Kwanza - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-01-08 - 2016-10-11 (9 months)
3rd Officer: Ngol cubango - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-07-16 - 2015-10-17 (3 months)
3rd Officer: SONANGOL GIRASSOL - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-05-13 - 2015-07-16 (2 months)
3rd Officer: B GAS SUMMIT - LPG / LNG / 2018-01-10 - 2018-05-15 (4 months)
3rd Officer: B GAS MARGRETHE - LPG / LNG / 2017-07-11 - 2017-11-15 (4 months)
3rd Officer: B GAS Champion - LPG / LNG / 2017-02-20 - 2017-06-26 (4 months)
3rd Officer: CSL TACOMA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-30 - 2016-12-14 (3 months)