Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
2nd Officer: The Sheriff - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-01-17 - 2024-04-17 (3 months)
3rd Officer: The Sheriff - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-10-26 - 2024-01-16 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Contship Gin - Container Ship / 2023-11-01 - 2024-04-17 (6 months)
2nd Officer: LEPTIS STAR - Cement Carrier / 2022-12-23 - 2023-05-27 (5 months)
2nd Officer: LEPTIS STAR - Cement Carrier / 2022-02-07 - 2022-09-05 (7 months)
2nd Officer: OYA STAR - Cement Carrier / 2020-11-11 - 2021-08-26 (9 months)
2nd Officer: LEPTIS STAR - Cement Carrier / 2019-10-05 - 2020-08-20 (10 months)
2nd Officer: DELTA - General cargo / 2022-10-15 - 2023-04-20 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Mt. Sun shun - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-06-29 - 2023-01-14 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Mt. Ship Trinity - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-08-07 - 2022-02-20 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Mt. Defiance - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-01-12 - 2021-07-16 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Mt. Defiance - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-06-11 - 2020-07-29 (1 year)
2nd Officer: Kapitan Babichev - Icebreaker / 2022-05-09 - 2022-12-01 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Kapitan Babichev - Icebreaker / 2021-05-06 - 2021-11-11 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Kapitan Babichev - Icebreaker / 2020-08-20 - 2020-11-13 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Tanker & VLCC - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-06-15 - 2022-11-30 (5 months)
2nd Officer: MSC BILBAO - Container Ship / 2021-12-06 - 2022-05-15 (5 months)
2nd Officer: MELINA - Container Ship / 2021-02-17 - 2021-07-19 (5 months)
2nd Officer: MELINA - Container Ship / 2020-07-07 - 2020-09-15 (2 months)
3rd Officer: MELINA - Container Ship / 2020-02-29 - 2020-07-06 (4 months)
3rd Officer: IAN H - Container Ship / 2019-06-20 - 2019-10-29 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Danae R - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-22 - 2022-04-05 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Good Luck - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-17 - 2021-01-29 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Avra Miteras - Container Ship / 2021-12-20 - 2022-02-23 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Belfast - General cargo / 2020-07-27 - 2021-02-20 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Tiyam - General cargo / 2019-08-18 - 2020-03-03 (6 months)
2nd Officer: MSC ISHYKA - Container Ship / 2017-05-04 - 2017-11-26 (7 months)
2nd Officer: MSC NORA - Container Ship / 2015-09-21 - 2016-03-12 (6 months)
2nd Officer: M/V Aurora - Dry Cargo / 2021-08-22 - 2021-12-20 (4 months)
2nd Officer: M/V Alice Star - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-05 - 2021-05-15 (8 months)
2nd Officer: M/V Konak - Dry Cargo / 2019-08-17 - 2020-07-12 (11 months)
2nd Officer: M/V Konak - Dry Cargo / 2018-12-02 - 2019-06-30 (7 months)
2nd Officer: M/V Aigaion - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-30 - 2018-08-03 (6 months)
2nd Officer: MV ISKANDER - General cargo / 2021-07-24 - 2021-12-20 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: SAROST 5 - AHTS / 2020-06-22 - 2020-08-05 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: MV ISKANDER - General cargo / 2019-09-27 - 2019-12-26 (3 months)
3rd Officer: AS Emma - Container Ship / 2021-12-18 - 2022-07-13 (7 months)
3rd Officer: AS Susanna - Container Ship / 2021-07-20 - 2021-09-24 (2 months)
2nd Officer: AS Susanna - Container Ship / 2021-07-09 - 2021-07-19 (10 days)
3rd Officer: AS Susanna - Container Ship / 2021-02-19 - 2021-07-08 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Maersk Wolfsburg - Container Ship / 2019-11-24 - 2020-01-18 (2 months)
Chief Officer: STI Hammersmith - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-06 - 2021-12-09 (5 months)
2nd Officer: STI Hammersmith - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-15 - 2021-02-15 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Liza - General cargo / 2020-10-19 - 2021-01-30 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Valda - General cargo / 2019-12-06 - 2020-06-21 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Valda - General cargo / 2019-05-07 - 2019-07-26 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Valda - General cargo / 2018-05-30 - 2018-10-19 (5 months)
2nd Officer: DR BRAVO - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-16 - 2018-02-02 (8 months)
2nd Officer: DANUM 68 - Container Ship / 2019-06-27 - 2020-12-02 (1 year)
3rd Officer: Talent link 1 - Tug boat / 2018-11-10 - 2019-05-07 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: TRANSFAIR - General cargo / 2013-09-15 - 2014-09-18 (1 year)
2nd Officer: Veronica B - Container Ship / 2020-07-22 - 2020-11-15 (4 months)
2nd Officer: RCC SHANGHAI - RO-RO / 2019-08-26 - 2019-11-26 (3 months)
2nd Officer: PLATINUM RAY - RO-RO / 2018-11-20 - 2019-04-04 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Friendly Islands - Bulk Carrier / 2020-04-01 - 2020-10-22 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Woodgate - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-18 - 2020-01-11 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Woodgate - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-01 - 2019-10-17 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Aristidis - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-21 - 2020-08-01 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Aiolos - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-02-26 - 2019-07-23 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Hengami Qeshm - General cargo / 2019-04-10 - 2020-04-16 (1 year)
Chief Officer: Delta Tankers - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-06-05 - 2023-03-22 (10 months)
Chief Officer: Australian Spirit - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-08-14 - 2021-11-21 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Zenith Spirit - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-04-25 - 2021-06-01 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Los Angeles Spirit - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-08-11 - 2020-12-15 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Nordic Rio - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-10-10 - 2020-03-19 (5 months)