Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
1st Officer: VOS Start - MRSV / 2018-03-01 - 2018-04-04 (1 month)
2nd Officer: VOS Start - MRSV / 2018-01-24 - 2018-02-21 (1 month)
2nd Officer: VOS Start - MRSV / 2017-11-28 - 2017-12-27 (1 month)
2nd Officer: Vos Start - MRSV / 2017-09-05 - 2017-10-31 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Bourbon Pearl - ROV Support vessel / 2017-03-14 - 2017-05-08 (2 months)
2nd Officer: т/х Борис Штоколов - RO-RO / 2017-05-12 - 2017-11-12 (6 months)
OS: Skulptorrr Tomskiy - Reefer / 2013-07-17 - 2014-01-19 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Navigator Ceres - LPG / LNG / 2017-06-19 - 2017-10-13 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Navigator Copernico - LPG / LNG / 2016-11-14 - 2017-03-17 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Navigator Copernico - LPG / LNG / 2016-04-07 - 2016-07-07 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Albert - LPG / LNG / 2016-01-07 - 2016-03-20 (2 months)
2nd Officer: YM KEELUNG - Container Ship / 2016-02-01 - 2016-07-29 (6 months)
2nd Officer: YM UNISON - Container Ship / 2015-04-14 - 2015-11-25 (7 months)
2nd Officer: YM BUSAN - Container Ship / 2014-02-17 - 2014-08-08 (6 months)
2nd Officer: ACX PEARL - Container Ship / 2011-09-20 - 2012-03-24 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Trouper - Container Ship / 2017-08-04 - 2017-11-22 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Nala Delmas - Container Ship / 2016-12-08 - 2017-02-08 (2 months)
Chief Officer: CMA CGM Aristote - Container Ship / 2016-10-18 - 2016-11-26 (1 month)
Chief Officer: CMA CGM Kailas - Container Ship / 2015-12-16 - 2016-04-16 (4 months)
2nd Officer: CMA CGM Kailas - Container Ship / 2015-11-01 - 2015-12-15 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Neptune Thelises - RO-RO / 2014-11-10 - 2015-04-27 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Neptune Thelises - RO-RO / 2014-04-22 - 2014-09-25 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Neptune Thelises - RO-RO / 2014-04-22 - 2014-09-25 (5 months)
AB Seaman: City of Oslo - RO-RO / 2013-02-12 - 2013-09-03 (7 months)
AB Seaman: City of oslo - RO-RO / 2012-04-24 - 2012-11-25 (7 months)
3rd Officer: SCHUBERT - Container Ship / 2017-02-28 - 2017-08-10 (5 months)
3rd Officer: SCHUBERT - Container Ship / 2016-06-21 - 2016-11-02 (4 months)
3rd Officer: MAERSK BINTAN - Container Ship / 2016-03-30 - 2016-06-14 (2 months)
3rd Officer: SINO BRIDGE - Container Ship / 2015-07-27 - 2015-12-21 (5 months)
2nd Officer: CAPE SOUNION - Container Ship / 2014-07-05 - 2014-12-20 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Guneshli - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-10-10 - 2016-03-03 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Guneshli - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-01-16 - 2015-05-28 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Guneshli - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-04-30 - 2014-08-31 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Absheron - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-08-11 - 2013-12-09 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Absheron - Crude Oil Tanker / 2012-11-02 - 2013-04-07 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Hibernia - Tug boat / 2013-09-16 - 2013-10-20 (1 month)
Safety Officer: Beaumerit - General cargo / 2013-01-20 - 2013-05-20 (4 months)
Safety Officer: Beaumerit - General cargo / 2012-03-14 - 2012-09-10 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Forline - Reefer / 2011-04-15 - 2011-08-01 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Cape Passero - Reefer / 2010-12-30 - 2011-05-25 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Ngol Luena - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-04-13 - 2013-10-13 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Welwitschia - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-11-24 - 2013-01-30 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Ngol Bengo - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-07-31 - 2012-11-24 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Владимир Игнатюк - Icebreaker / 2012-08-07 - 2012-11-16 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Heinrich j - Container Ship / 2013-07-04 - 2013-11-10 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Michael j - Container Ship / 2012-10-28 - 2013-02-28 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Cepheus j - Container Ship / 2012-03-23 - 2012-07-30 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Asian Sun - Container Ship / 2011-06-11 - 2011-12-17 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Pengalia - Container Ship / 2010-12-11 - 2011-04-07 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Soikamsk - General cargo / 2012-12-04 - 2013-04-04 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Maxim - General cargo / 2012-05-25 - 2012-08-08 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Maxim - General cargo / 2012-04-08 - 2012-05-25 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Sergey Gritsevets - General cargo / 2011-12-13 - 2012-03-14 (3 months)
3rd Officer: MAXIM - General cargo / 2011-10-08 - 2011-11-15 (1 month)
2nd Officer: FK SILA - General cargo / 2024-01-27 - 2024-07-24 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: MV AIDA IV - Passenger vessel / 2022-03-08 - 2022-04-19 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: MV WADI SUDR - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-23 - 2022-02-18 (11 months)
2nd Officer: CLIPPER TRIUMPH - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-15 - 2023-09-20 (3 months)
2nd Officer: ESL AMERICA - General cargo / 2022-05-26 - 2022-12-11 (6 months)
2nd Officer: ESL AMERICA - General cargo / 2021-04-17 - 2021-12-06 (8 months)
2nd Officer: ESL AMERICA - General cargo / 2020-06-06 - 2020-11-07 (5 months)
2nd Officer: ESL AMERICA - General cargo / 2019-07-26 - 2019-12-06 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Houtmangracht - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-05-31 - 2023-09-20 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Diamantgracht - General cargo / 2022-10-04 - 2023-02-10 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Pietersgracht - Heavy lift vessel / 2022-02-17 - 2022-07-12 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Heerengracht - General cargo / 2021-08-17 - 2021-12-19 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Elandsgracht - General cargo / 2020-11-16 - 2021-04-20 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Amber Trader - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-02-14 - 2023-09-14 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Amber Sky - General cargo / 2021-07-11 - 2021-11-29 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Amber Sky - General cargo / 2020-10-16 - 2021-03-01 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Amber Sky - General cargo / 2019-12-15 - 2020-06-26 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Amber Trader - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-04-21 - 2019-10-14 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Wilson Algeciras - General cargo / 2023-01-24 - 2023-09-11 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: Industrial Aim - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-10-28 - 2022-04-10 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Bbc eagle - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-11-11 - 2021-06-08 (7 months)
2nd Officer: MSC BARBARA - Container Ship / 2023-03-27 - 2023-09-04 (5 months)
2nd Officer: OOCL ST.LAWRENCE - Container Ship / 2022-07-23 - 2022-11-22 (4 months)
2nd Officer: TAIPEI TRADER - Container Ship / 2022-01-21 - 2022-06-25 (5 months)
2nd Officer: TOKYO TRADER - Container Ship / 2021-05-09 - 2021-09-23 (4 months)
2nd Officer: ELAZIZ - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-03 - 2020-12-29 (6 months)
2nd Officer: OMSKIY-157 - General cargo / 2022-11-28 - 2023-02-22 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Omskiy-204 - General cargo / 2022-02-02 - 2022-06-25 (5 months)